Centerstate Bank, N.A. v. Barhatkov et al
Plaintiff: Centerstate Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Sukasha Nankoo, Alexander Barhatkov, Andrey Barhatkov and Spring Lake Association, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01277
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Seminole
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER STRIKING #5 Amended Notice of Removal. This case has been remanded and the case is now closed. Defendant is cautioned to not file additional unauthorized filings. Future unauthorized filings may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/14/2018. (JRJ)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 (**STRICKEN PER 6 ORDER) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Court, case number 2017-CA000-99-14H filed in State Court on 04/28/17. filed by Alexander Barhatkov.(JP) Modified on 8/14/2018 (DMA).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: #1 Notice of Removal. The case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of Court for the Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is thereafter DIRECTED to terminate all pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/9/2018. (JRJ)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander Barhatkov. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alexander Barhatkov, Andrey Barhatkov, Sukasha Nankoo, Spring Lake Association, Inc. filed in State Court on 6/08/2018 by Centerstate Bank, N.A..(DMA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Court, case number 2017-CA-000999-14H-K filed in State Court on 4/28/2017. filed by Alexander Barhatkov. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docs Part 1, #2 State Court Docs Part 2)(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centerstate Bank, N.A. v. Barhatkov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centerstate Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Douglas Paul Gerber
Represented By: Grey Squires-Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukasha Nankoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Barhatkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrey Barhatkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Lake Association, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?