United States of America v. Net One International, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Net One International, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01346
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Paul G Byron
2 Judge: Embry J Kidd
3 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 30 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Net One International, Inc. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SPM)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation #28 is ADOPTED and CONFIRMED and made a part of this Order. Plaintiff's Second Renewed Request for Default Judgment #26 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $1,600,000 with interest from the date of the judgment at the legal rate in effect on the date of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1961. Further, Plaintiff is to be awarded the costs and disbursements incurred by bringing this action. This Court retains jurisdiction to determine the amount of costs and disbursements to be awarded. Thereafter, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/16/2021. (RMF)ctp
February 25, 2021 Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #26 United States's Motion for Default Judgment. I respectfully recommend that the Motion be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/25/2021. (JLE)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida have been amended effective February 1, 2021, and will apply, as amended and in accordance with the January 13, 2021 Standing Order, to this case for all filings made on or after February 1, 2021. Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the striking of non-compliant filings, dismissal of this action, or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/27/2021.(RMF)ctp
July 7, 2020 Filing 26 Second MOTION for Default Judgment against Net One International, Inc. Under Rule 55(b)(1) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
June 29, 2020 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Net One International, Inc. (KNC)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 United States of America's Motion to Reconsider, construed as a renewed motion for entry of Clerk's Default.Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/26/2020. (JLE)
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order on Motion for Default Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice #21 United States's Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. The Clerk is directed to vacate the entry of the Clerk's Default at Docket Entry #11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/5/2020. (JLE)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 RENEWED MOTION for default judgment against Net One International, Inc. by Clerk Under Rule 55(b)(1) by United States of America. (Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 10/18/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use correct judge's code on future pleadings.
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:18-cv-1346-Orl-78EJK. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:18-cv-1346-Orl-40EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of US Marshal Marisol Chaves re #17 Order on motion to supplement by United States of America. (Ragler, Phillip)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to supplement the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/4/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to supplement the Record by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ragler, Phillip)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adopting #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 MOTION for default judgment against Net One International, Inc. filed by United States of America. Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Clerk Under Rule 55(b)(1) (Doc. 13) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may have thirty (30) days to supplement the record. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/19/2019. (MMW)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 MOTION for default judgment against Net One International, Inc. filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/4/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for default judgment against Net One International, Inc. by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/29/2019. (MMW)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 **VACATED PER ORDER #22** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Net One International, Inc. (RDO) Modified on 2/6/2020 (BIA).
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to show cause filed by United States of America. (Ragler, Phillip)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Net One International, Inc. by United States of America. (Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff United States of America. Service was executed on the defendant on or about November 13, 2018. Defendant has failed to respond to the complaint and Plaintiff has failed to apply for entry of default. Plaintiff show cause within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why the complaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10(a). Failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/17/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 11/13/18 by United States of America as to Net One International, Inc.. (RDO)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (Ragler, Phillip)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Ragler, Phillip)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/28/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/28/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Net One International, Inc.. (issued at intake) (RDO)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Net One International, Inc. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ALL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Net One International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Net One International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?