Underwood et al v. Doll House, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sara Underwood, Jessica Burciaga, Claudia Sampedro, Mariana Davalos, Lucy Pinder, Iesha Marie Crespo and Tiffany Toth Gray
Defendant: Doll House, Inc. and Wilan Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv01362
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
0 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
1 Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 16 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/15/2018. (Presnell, Gregory)
October 11, 2018 15 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons on Goldstar Management, LLC)(Khomiak, Ludmila)
September 26, 2018 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Doll House, Inc., Wilan Corporation identifying Corporate Parent goldstar management, llc for Doll House, Inc., Wilan Corporation.. (Osborne, William)
September 26, 2018 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Doll House, Inc., Wilan Corporation. Related case(s): no (Osborne, William)
September 20, 2018 12 Featured Case INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendants. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/4/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/20/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
September 19, 2018 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Doll House, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Osborne, William)
September 19, 2018 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Wilan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Osborne, William)
September 17, 2018 9 RETURN of service executed on August 31, 2018 by Iesha Marie Crespo, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Burciaga, Sara Underwood, Claudia Sampedro, Mariana Davalos as to Wilan Corporation. (Khomiak, Ludmila)
September 17, 2018 8 RETURN of service executed on August 31, 2018 by Iesha Marie Crespo, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Burciaga, Sara Underwood, Claudia Sampedro, Mariana Davalos as to Doll House, Inc.. (Khomiak, Ludmila)
September 10, 2018 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jessica Burciaga, Iesha Marie Crespo, Mariana Davalos, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Claudia Sampedro, Sara Underwood. Related case(s): yes (Khomiak, Ludmila) Modified on 9/11/2018 (BIA). (Attached PDF indicates no related cases)
September 10, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Jessica Burciaga, Iesha Marie Crespo, Mariana Davalos, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Claudia Sampedro, Sara Underwood. (Khomiak, Ludmila)
August 27, 2018 5 Featured Case INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/27/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
August 27, 2018 4 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/27/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
August 20, 2018 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H) (BIA)
August 20, 2018 2 SUMMONS issued as to Doll House, Inc., Wilan Corporation. (Mailed to counsel for service) (BIA)
August 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Doll House, Inc., Wilan Corporation, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-76161) filed by Iesha Marie Crespo, Tiffany Toth Gray, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Burciaga, Sara Underwood, Claudia Sampedro, Mariana Davalos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood et al v. Doll House, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iesha Marie Crespo
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: Ludmila Khomiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doll House, Inc.
Represented By: William G. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilan Corporation
Represented By: William G. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?