Williams v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: David T. Williams
Defendant: John Wilbur Holloway, The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company and Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv01492
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 19 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. James M. Nicholas appointed as Mediator. (SPM)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019, Discovery due by 1/17/2020, Dispositive motions due by 2/14/2020, Pretrial statement due by 7/13/2020, All other motions due by 6/1/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/3/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/1/2019, Trial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing 8/3/2020 Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/1/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/9/2018. (DJD)
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing Exhibits 1 and 2 in support re #16 Response to motion by Standard Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Furman, Wendy) Modified on 11/6/2018 (SPM).
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to remand to State Court Responses from Standard Insurance Company and Minnesota Life Insurance Company due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/18/2018. (Smith, Thomas)
October 18, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to October 31, 2018, to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to remand to State Court by Standard Insurance Company, The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 10/18/2018 (SPM).
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to remand to State Court by David T. Williams. (Volk, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Volk, David)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by David T. Williams. (Volk, David)
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David T. Williams. Related case(s): no (Volk, David)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Telephonically at case management conference. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in their case management report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt to resolve the disagreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/1/2018. (Spaulding, Karla)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Standard Insurance Company, The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Securian Financial Group, Inc. for The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company; Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc. for Standard Insurance Company.. (Furman, Wendy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Standard Insurance Company, The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): n (Furman, Wendy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by Standard Insurance Company, The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/27/2018. (DJD) ctp
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/11/2018. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 9/27/2018. (DJD) ctp
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Furman, Wendy)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Wilbur Holloway, Standard Insurance Company, The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by David T. Williams. FILED IN BREVARD COUNTY COURT ON 8/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(SPM)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County, case number 05-2018-CA-039822 filed in State Court on 8/3/2018. Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL076749 filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2-Part 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David T. Williams
Represented By: Michael P. Sapourn
Represented By: David Joseph Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wilbur Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel R. Lazaro
Represented By: Wendy L. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?