Crouch v. The Raymond Corporation
Plaintiff: Harry Crouch, Jr.
Defendant: The Raymond Corporation
Interested Party: ABB Holdings, Inc. and Gallagher Bassett Services
Case Number: 6:2018cv01500
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #38 Mediation report. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/5/19. (LAM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 38 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 12-4-19. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 12/04/2019 at 1:00 p.m. before Tony Schoder. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 36 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Stan W. Strickland appointed as mediator. (RDO)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/13/2019, Dispositive motions due by 2/28/2020, All other motions due by 5/8/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/2/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/6/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 2/28/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/8/2019. (LAM) Modified on 10/9/2019 (LAM).
October 2, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Case management and scheduling order by The Raymond Corporation. (Edson, Kelli)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #32 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/19/2019. (MB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for protective order by The Raymond Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Stipulation and Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(Edson, Kelli) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Motion to extend time. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/15/2019. (ED)
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline by The Raymond Corporation. (Edson, Kelli) Modified on 7/15/2019 (BIA).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AS LOCAL COUNSEL. Attorney Kenneth H. Haney terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/23/2019. (MB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Substitute Attorney as Local Counsel by The Raymond Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edson, Kelli) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #26 DEFENDANT, THE RAYMOND CORPORATION'S, MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AS LOCAL COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/9/2019. (MB)
May 8, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Attorney as Local Counsel by The Raymond Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edson, Kelli) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 8, 2019 Filing 25 Written designation and consent to act by Kelli Ayers Edson on behalf of The Raymond Corporation. Local Counsel: Kelli A. Edson. Non-Resident Counsel: Raymond D. Jamieson. (Edson, Kelli)
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelli Ayers Edson on behalf of The Raymond Corporation (Edson, Kelli)
December 13, 2018 Filing 23 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Stan W. Strickland appointed as Mediator. (BIA)
December 13, 2018 Set scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2019, Discovery due by 7/15/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2019, Pretrial statement due by 2/14/2020, All other motions due by 2/28/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 4/1/2020 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 1/2/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/1/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2019 (BIA)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/13/2018. (TKW)
December 7, 2018 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Haney, Kenneth)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion for Parties to Conduct Rule 26(F) Conference Telephonically, provided the parties agree on the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/27/2018. (MB)
November 19, 2018 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Parties to Conduct Rule 26(F) Conference Telephonically by The Raymond Corporation and Harry Crouch, Jr.. (Haney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/20/2018 (BIA).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/16/2018. (MB)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Raymond Jamieson to appear pro hac vice by The Raymond Corporation. (Haney, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
October 10, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Raymond D. Jamieson, appearing on behalf of The Raymond Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077573.). (RCN)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond D. Jamieson as Counsel for Defendant, Designation and Consent to Act, and Acceptance of Designation and Consent to Act by Kenneth H. Haney on behalf of The Raymond Corporation (Haney, Kenneth) Modified on 10/2/2018 (BIA).
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by The Raymond Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Raymond Consolidated Corporation for The Raymond Corporation.. (Haney, Kenneth)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Raymond Corporation. Related case(s): No (Haney, Kenneth)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel Scott B. Miller of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Third Party Lien by The Raymond Corporation (Haney, Kenneth) Modified on 9/18/2018 (BIA).
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Harry Crouch, Jr. (Rotstein, Jonathan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Harry Crouch, Jr. Related case(s): no (Rotstein, Jonathan)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 DEFENDANT THE RAYMOND CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND INCLUDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/13/2018. (MB)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Harry Crouch, Jr. (Rotstein, Jonathan) Modified on 9/14/2018 (BIA). **Document not signed. Counsel to refile.
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/13/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/13/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel by The Raymond Corporation. Originally filed in State Court 8/3/2018. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Raymond Corporation. Originally filed in State Court 4/3/2018.(LMM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The Raymond Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Harry Crouch, Jr. Originally filed in State Court 10/7/2017.(LMM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2017 31688 CICI filed in State Court on 10/7/2017. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-76793 filed by The Raymond Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(LMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crouch v. The Raymond Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Crouch, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Raymond Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth H. Haney
Represented By: Raymond Jamieson
Represented By: Kelli Ayers Edson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ABB Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Scott B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gallagher Bassett Services
Represented By: Scott B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?