City of Palm Bay v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Palm Bay
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Scott Fishman, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, John Gayden, M.D., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo International PLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Russell Portenoy, Edge Pharmacy, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Ibem R. Borges, M.D., Perry Fine, Lynn Webster, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, Dr. Victor Thiagaraj Selvaraj and Cephalon, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01554
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #32 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, #33 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, 31 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail NOT resent to Victor Thiagaraj Selvaraj. (JP)
October 22, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 18 Order on motion for extension of time to answer and 23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Mail resent to Victor Thiagaraj Selvaraj. (ALL)
October 12, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brien T. O'Connor, appearing on behalf of Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077679.) Related document: #30 Unopposed MOTION for Brien O'Connor of the law firm of Ropes & Gray LLP to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
October 12, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew J. O'Connor, appearing on behalf of Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077679.) Related document: #29 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew O'Connor of the law firm of Ropes & Gray LLP to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
October 5, 2018 Filing 36 Case transferred from Florida Middle has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-46132, filed 10/05/2018. (MAA)
October 4, 2018 Filing 35 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio MDL case number: 2804. CTO-57. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BIA)
October 3, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Order to strike, #15 Interested persons order by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Furness, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 motion for Andrew O'Connor to appear pro hac vice; granting #30 motion for Brien O'Connor to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/3/2018. (SPM)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 motion for J. Matthew Donohue to appear pro hac vice; granting #27 motion for Joseph Franco to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/3/2018. (SPM)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. On or before 11/8/2018, McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Corporation shall respond to the Complaint. The motion fails to state good cause to delay a response to the Complaint, although the Court will consider further motions related to the JPML proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/3/2018. (Irick, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joseph Franco, appearing on behalf of Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077386.) Related document: #27 MOTION for Joseph Franco to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
October 3, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Matthew Donahue, appearing on behalf of Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077387.) Related document: #26 MOTION for J. Matthew Donohue to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
October 3, 2018 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Brien O'Connor of the law firm of Ropes & Gray LLP to appear pro hac vice by Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals. (Hearn, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew O'Connor of the law firm of Ropes & Gray LLP to appear pro hac vice by Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals. (Hearn, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 3, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals.. (Hearn, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Joseph Franco to appear pro hac vice by Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. (Kolos, Chris) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 3, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for J. Matthew Donohue to appear pro hac vice by Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. (Kolos, Chris) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 3, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Kissane, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer)
October 2, 2018 Set deadlines for Ibem R. Borges, M.D.. Answer due by 10/22/2018. (BIA)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 10/22/2018, Defendant Ibem R. Borges, M.D. shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/2/2018. (Irick, Daniel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint by Ibem R. Borges, M.D.. (Pillay, Chantal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 1, 2018 Filing 21 Remark: Doc. #20 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/1/18. (MT)
September 28, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by AmerisourceBergen Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Amerisource Bergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Corporation.. (Herrera, Sujey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Debbie Satyal on behalf of Ibem R. Borges, M.D. (Satyal, Debbie)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 10/31/2018, Defendant Scott Fishman shall respond to the Complaint. Good cause has not been stated for a further extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/27/2018. (Irick, Daniel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Scott Fishman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 9/28/2018 (BIA).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to strike re: #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/27/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/27/2018. (ctp)(JLC)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed byDeputy Clerk on 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC)
September 26, 2018 Set deadline for Edge Pharmacy. Answer due by 10/26/2018. (BIA)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 10/26/2018, Defendant Edge Pharmacy shall respond to the Complaint. No further extensions should be sought absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/26/2018. (Irick, Daniel)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #16 - CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer) Modified on 9/27/2018 (BIA).
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 Joint Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 9/27/2018 (BIA).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to strike re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (JLC) ).
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Edge Pharmacy. (Meyers, Addison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #10 - CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Furness, Amy) Modified on 9/27/2018 (BIA).
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Hugo L. Garcia of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Mark S. Cheffo, Hayden A. Coleman, Steven A. Reed, Harvey Bartle, Charles C. Lifland, lngo W. Sprie, Jr., Sean Morris, J. Matthew Donohue, Joseph L. Franco, Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew J. O'Connor, and S. Amy Spencer of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2804, Information emailed to MDL Panel on 09/20/2018, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (BIA)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/20/2018. (Irick, Daniel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #2 Complaint by Edge Pharmacy. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ibem R. Borges, M.D., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Edge Pharmacy, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, John Gayden, M.D., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, McKesson Corporation, Russell Portenoy, Purdue Pharma L.P., Victor Thiagaraj Selvaraj, Lynn Webster with Jury Demand filed by City of Palm Bay in Brevard County Circuit Court on 05/14/2018.(BIA)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 05-2018-CA-028116 filed in State Court on 05/14/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-77036 filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F Part1, #8 Exhibit F Part 2, #9 Exhibit F Part 3, #10 Exhibit F Part 4, #11 Exhibit F Part 5)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Palm Bay v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Eric R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Sujey Scarlett Herrera
Represented By: Edward M. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gayden, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Kissane
Represented By: Rachel Robbie Chewning
Represented By: Christopher John Donegan
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: S. Amy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edge Pharmacy
Represented By: Addison J. Meyers
Represented By: John Goran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Spencer H. Silverglate
Represented By: Francisco Ramos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: William Newton Shepherd
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Chris Nick Kolos
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ibem R. Borges, M.D.
Represented By: Debbie Satyal
Represented By: Chantal Pillay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Eric R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Eric R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Victor Thiagaraj Selvaraj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Palm Bay
Represented By: Michael H. Kahn
Represented By: John Fletcher Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?