Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al v. Hulsey et al
Plaintiff: Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC, Nephron S.C., Inc. and Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc., U.S. Compounding Inc. doing business as U.S. Compounding Pharmacy and Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv01573
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ENDORSED ORDER. It is ORDERED that bench books containing paper copies of all "A" List exhibits shall be delivered to the Clerk's office for delivery to chambers by NOON on Wednesday, March 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/26/2021. (LAM)
March 26, 2021 Filing 245 NOTICE of CONTINUED HEARING: The final pretrial conference which commenced 3/25/2021 will continue 4/6/2021 at 01:00 PM, or any other time that may be set by the Court on 4/6/2021 after the conclusion of the sanctions amount hearing scheduled that morning, in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell.(LAM)
March 26, 2021 Filing 244 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The evidentiary hearing to determine amount of sanctions (See Doc. 221) previously scheduled for 4/6/21 at 1:30 PM is rescheduled. New hearing time: Hearing reset for 4/6/2021 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (LAM)
March 25, 2021 Filing 243 Minute Entry for final pretrial conference held before Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/25/2021. Court Reporter: Heather Suarez. (LAM)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER denying #227 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/24/2021. (AMP)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #225 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/24/2021. (AMP)
March 24, 2021 Set/reset deadlines as to #232 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 3/29/2021 (MEJ)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER re #232 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #222 Notice of hearing. Defendants shall respond to the motion by March 29, 2021. Nikole Setzler Mergo, Mary Ruth Houston, and Michael Tessitore shall attend the evidentiary hearing that was set on this matter to be held on April 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/23/2021. (LAM)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying #230 Motion to allow Clay Guinn to testify remotely at trial. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/23/2021. (LAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2021: #1 Main Document) (LAM). Modified on 3/23/2021 to attach complete PDF document. NEF regenerated (LAM).
March 22, 2021 Filing 238 RESPONSE in Opposition re #228 Omnibus MOTION In Limine and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Excerpt from Deposition of S. Hulsey, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Excerpt from Deposition of G. Fernandez, #3 Exhibit 3 -- March 11, 2021 Email from B. Bundren to N. Mergo, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Exhibit 34 to Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to USC's First Set of Interrogatories)(Nokes, Scarlett)
March 22, 2021 Filing 237 RESPONSE in Opposition re #229 Omnibus MOTION In Limine regarding Evidence to be Presented at Trial filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pls' Ex. 67, #2 Exhibit B - Pls' Ex. 132, #3 Exhibit C - Pls' Ex. 16, #4 Exhibit D - Pls' Ex. 25, #5 Exhibit E - Pls' Ex. 161, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpts from Hulsey Depo.)(Mergo, Nikole)
March 22, 2021 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #227 Motion to Bifurcate filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion Fin. Info. Tech. v. iControl Systems, #2 Exhibit B - Verdict Form Fin. Info. Tech. v. iControl Systems, #3 Exhibit C - Opinion - Motorola v. Hytera, #4 Exhibit D - Verdict Form Liqwd, Inc. v. L'Oreal U.S.A., #5 Exhibit E - Pattern Civ Jury Inst. 11th Cir. 115 (2019))(Cluverius, Jennifer)
March 17, 2021 Filing 235 RESPONSE in Opposition re #225 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Previously Undisclosed Witnesses From Trial Witness List And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration of D. Evans, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Excerpts from Deposition of R. Hopkins, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Excerpts from Deposition of G. Fernandez, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Excerpts from Deposition of C. Guinn, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Excerpts from Deposition of S. Duell, #6 Exhibit 6 -- Excerpts from Deposition of D. Marguglio, #7 Exhibit 7 -- Excerpts from Deposition of P. Fitzmaurice, #8 Exhibit 8 -- Excerpts from Deposition of S. Hulsey, #9 Exhibit 9 -- Excerpts from Deposition of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6))(Nokes, Scarlett)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ENDORSED ORDER granting #233 Motion to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/17/2021. (LAM)
March 16, 2021 Filing 233 Joint MOTION to File Excess Pages With Responses to Ombinus Motions In Limine by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
March 15, 2021 Filing 232 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A Affidavit of Nikole S. Mergo, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B Declaration of Mary Ruth Houston, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C Affidavit of Michael A. Tessitore)(Mergo, Nikole)
March 12, 2021 Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re #230 MOTION to Allow Clay Guinn to Testify Remotely filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Clark, Jaclyn)
March 11, 2021 Filing 230 MOTION to Allow Clay Guinn to Testify Remotely by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of C.Guinn)(Nokes, Scarlett) Modified text on 3/12/2021 (TNP).
March 11, 2021 Filing 229 Omnibus MOTION In Limine regarding Evidence to be Presented at Trial by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Nokes, Scarlett) Modified text on 3/12/2021 (TNP).
March 11, 2021 Filing 228 Omnibus MOTION In Limine and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 28 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 37), #2 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 30 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 40), #3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition of Clay Guinn, #4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition of Gus Fernandez, #5 Exhibit Excerpts from the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Nephron, #6 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition of Shelly Hulsey, #7 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 29 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 29), #8 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 38 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 38), #9 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 40 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 63), #10 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 51 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 85), #11 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 52 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 86), #12 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 81 (Distler Ex. 7), #13 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 138 (Nephron Proof of Claim dated 2/26/21), #14 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition of Robert Hopkins, #15 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 20 (List B) 2014 Blog Post, #16 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 21 (List B) 2016 Blog Post, #17 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 22 (List B) 2014 Blog Post, #18 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition of David Marguglio, #19 Exhibit Nephron's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (dated March 13, 2019), #20 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 14 (Nephron 30)(b)(6) Ex. 20), #21 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 16 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 23), #22 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 17 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 24), #23 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 24 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 33), #24 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 27 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 36), #25 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 31 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 41), #26 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 39 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 58), #27 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 41 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 66), #28 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 42 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 67), #29 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 43 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 68), #30 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 45 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 70), #31 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit 47 (Nephron 30(b)(6) Ex. 75))(Mergo, Nikole) Modified text on 3/12/2021 (TNP).
March 11, 2021 Filing 227 MOTION to Bifurcate by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ENDORSED ORDER directing Defendants to respond to #225 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Previously Undisclosed Witnesses From Trial Witness List And Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Response due by 3/17/2021. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/9/2021. (LAM)
March 8, 2021 Filing 225 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Previously Undisclosed Witnesses From Trial Witness List And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from S. Nokes to N. Mergo 2-16-21, #2 Exhibit B - USC's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit C - USC's Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories 1-4-19, #4 Exhibit D - Adamis Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories 4-29-19, #5 Exhibit E - USC's Supplemental Amended Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, 7-15-19, #6 Exhibit F - USC's Supplemental Amended Answers to Certain Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, 11-12-19, #7 Exhibit G - Defendants' Supplemental Initial Disclosures, #8 Exhibit H - Nephron's 2-27-29 Letter to Defendants' Counsel, #9 Exhibit I - Defendants' 3-22-29 Letter to Nephron's Counsel)(Mergo, Nikole)
March 4, 2021 Filing 224 PRETRIAL statement by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List A, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List B, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List A, #4 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List B, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' list of all deposition to be offered in evidence at trial in lieu of live testimony, #6 Exhibit Defendants' list of all deposition to be offered in evidence at trial in lieu of live testimony, #7 Exhibit Listing of each stipulated fact amongst the parties that will require no proof at trial, #8 Exhibit Proposed voir dire questions, #9 Exhibit Plaintiffs' proposed verdict form, #10 Exhibit Defendants' proposed verdict form, #11 Exhibit Proposed jury instructions)(Mergo, Nikole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Lee Bentley, III on behalf of Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Bentley, Arthur)
March 1, 2021 Filing 222 NOTICE of EVIDENTIARY HEARING: Hearing to determine amount of sanctions (See Doc. 221) set for 4/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. See notice for instructions regarding the preparation of exhibits.(LAM)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER confirming and adopting #212 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. The Court holds Defendants in civil contempt for violating the Consent Preliminary Injunction #29. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2021. (AMP)
February 17, 2021 Filing 220 RESPONSE to objections to #212 Report and Recommendations filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Table delineating the duplication and highlighted pages from Dkt. 139 and 216, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demonstrative Plaintiffs handed up during oral argument demonstrating the CPI's evolution, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Demonstrative timeline handed up by Plaintiffs which demonstrates the procedural case history juxtaposed against the hiring of Lane, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - order in adidas AG v. 2017nmd.com, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Excerpts from the deposition transcript of Susan Duell)(Mergo, Nikole)
February 11, 2021 Filing 219 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The final pretrial conference previously scheduled for 3/26/2021 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/25/2021 at 02:15 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (LAM)
February 1, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Response to Objection due by 2/17/2021. (MEJ)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ENDORSED ORDER granting #217 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline is extended to February 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/29/2021. (LAM)
January 28, 2021 Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #216 Objection To Report & Recommendation by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
January 26, 2021 Filing 216 OBJECTION re #212 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Nephron S.C. . (Nokes, Scarlett)
January 20, 2021 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Pretrial statement due by 3/4/2021, All other motions due by 3/11/2021 (MEJ)
January 19, 2021 Filing 215 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The final pretrial conference previously scheduled for 3/18/2021 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (LAM)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ENDORSED ORDER granting #213 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines are extended as requested in the motion. Permission is granted to meet remotely if a compliant final pretrial statement can be agreed upon. Further, responses to all other motions, including motions in limine, are due 3/22/2021. The final pretrial conference will be rescheduled by separate notice. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/19/2021. (LAM)
January 15, 2021 Filing 213 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Meeting and Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Nokes, Scarlett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified text on 1/19/2021 (MEJ).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND CERTIFICATION re #129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/12/2021. (MKH)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #160 Motion to Exclude expert report. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/11/2021. (AMP)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER denying #158 Motion to Exclude expert report. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/11/2021. (AMP)
January 4, 2021 Sealed Document S-209. (MAA)
December 17, 2020 Sealed Documents. S-206, S-207, S-208. (AKC)
December 16, 2020 Filing 205 Joint STIPULATION regarding December 17, 2020 Hearing by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Joint Exhibit List for December 17, 2020 Hearng)(Nokes, Scarlett) Modified text on 12/16/2020 (MEJ).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #203 Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/10/2020. (LAM)
December 9, 2020 Filing 203 Joint MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Laptop Computers and Related Cables At Hearing Commencing December 17, 2020 by All Plaintiffs. (Houston, Mary)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ENDORSED ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion proceedings scheduled December 17, 2020, will be SEALED, along with any transcript resulting therefrom. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/9/2020. (LAM)
December 9, 2020 Filing 200 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Heather Suarez. (HLS)
December 9, 2020 Filing 199 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2020 re: #129 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause before Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Suarez, RPR, FCRR, heathersuarez.usocr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 12/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2021. (HLS)
December 8, 2020 Sealed Document (S-201). (MEJ)
December 8, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE of compliance re #197 Order on Motion to Seal by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Cluverius, Jennifer)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #195 Motion to Seal. On or before 5:00 p.m. on December 8, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file under seal unredacted copies of Mr. Wiggins's expert report and the transcript of Mr. Wiggins's deposition. See Doc. Nos. 160-2, 160-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/7/2020. (MKH)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER adopting #165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/7/2020. (AMP)
December 7, 2020 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION to Seal And Incorporated Memorandum of Law In Support of Sealing by All Plaintiffs. (Mergo, Nikole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re #160 MOTION to Exclude or Limit Defendants' Damages Expert, C. Donald Wiggins. On or before 5:00 p.m. on Monday December 7, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file an unredacted copy of the Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Rebuttal Expert Report of C. Donald Wiggins (Doc. No. 160-2) and an unredacted copy of the transcript of Wiggins's deposition (Doc. No. 160-4) on the public docket. If Plaintiffs contend that the filing of these unredacted exhibits should be made under seal, on or before 12:00 p.m. on Monday December 7, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a motion to seal in compliance with Local Rule 1.09(a) and the Eleventh Circuit's standards for filing documents under seal. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/4/2020. (MKH)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #158 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Carrie L. Distler. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. See order for details. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/4/2020. (LAM)
November 19, 2020 Filing 191 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman: MOTION HEARING held on 11/19/2020 re #129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (DIGITAL) (ECJ)
November 18, 2020 Filing 190 RESPONSE to objections to #165 Report and Recommendations filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
November 18, 2020 Filing 189 RESPONSE to objections to #165 Report and Recommendations filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
November 18, 2020 Filing 188 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Authority)(Houston, Mary)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #185 Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/17/2020. (MKH)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #184 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Plaintiffs shall file the supplemental authority as described in the motion on or before November 18, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/17/2020. (MKH)
November 16, 2020 Filing 185 Joint MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Laptop Computers and Related Cables At Hearing on November 19, 2020 by All Plaintiffs. (Houston, Mary)
November 16, 2020 Filing 184 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs. (Houston, Mary) Modified event on 11/16/2020 (MEJ).
November 2, 2020 Filing 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re #160 MOTION to Exclude or Limit Defendants' Damages Expert, C. Donald Wiggins filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
November 2, 2020 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #158 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Carrie L. Distler filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition transcript of Carrie L. Distler, #2 Exhibit Fla. Form Jury Instruction)(Mergo, Nikole)
October 27, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Response due by 11/18/2020. (MEJ)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ENDORSED ORDER granting #179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Objections to the R&R. The responses are due November 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/26/2020. (LAM)
October 23, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Hearing on the Motion for Order to Show Cause (Doc. 129) is rescheduled. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 11/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5D before Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (MKH)
October 23, 2020 Filing 179 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #177 Objection, #176 Objection by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
October 22, 2020 Filing 178 Joint Notice Regarding 11/19/20 Hearing and MOTION to Reschedule Hearing by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. re #166 Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Nokes, Scarlett) Modified event on 10/23/2020 (MEJ). Modified on 10/26/2020 (MEJ).
October 21, 2020 Filing 177 OBJECTION re #165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. . (Nokes, Scarlett)
October 21, 2020 Filing 176 OBJECTION As to Count VII re #165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (MEJ).
October 20, 2020 Filing 175 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 10-16-2020. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Firestone, Matt)
October 16, 2020 Sealed Document (S-174). (MEJ)
October 15, 2020 Filing 173 STATUS report Regarding Pending Bankruptcy Proceeding by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Seal. On or before 5:00 p.m. on October 20, 2020, Defendants shall file under seal Exhibits 1, 3, and 7 filed in support of their Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Carrie L. Distler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/13/2020. (MKH)
October 12, 2020 Filing 171 RESPONSE to Motion re #159 Unopposed MOTION to Seal to Exhibits 1, 3, and 7 of #158 Motion to Exclude Opinion of Carrie L. Distler filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 2/12/2021, All other motions due by 2/26/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for DATE CERTAIN 4/19/2021 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/17/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/9/2020. (LAM)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #168 Motion to Continue. With consent of counsel responses received via email to my chambers, the trial is continued to a date certain April 19, 2021. A second amended case management order will separately enter. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/9/2020. (LAM)
October 8, 2020 Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial and Extension of Related Deadlines in the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. (Mergo, Nikole) Modified on 10/9/2020 (MEJ).
October 8, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The final pretrial conference previously scheduled for 12/11/2020 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 12/10/2020 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Senior Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (LAM)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law : Motion Hearing set for Thursday 11/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5D before Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. See PDF Order for additional requirements and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/8/2020. (MKH)
October 8, 2020 Set/reset deadlines as to #160 MOTION to Exclude or Limit Defendants' Damages Expert, C. Donald Wiggins, #158 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Carrie L. Distler. Responses due by 11/2/2020 (MEJ)
October 7, 2020 Filing 165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court GRANT in part an DENY in part the motion for summary judgment. It is recommended that the Court GRANT summary judgment in favor of Defendants and against Nephron on Count VII of the third amended complaint; and DENY the motion for summary judgment in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/7/2020. (MKH)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ENDORSED ORDER granting #163 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. The deadline to respond to the Daubert motions is extended to November 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/7/2020. (LAM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 163 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply DAUBERT MOTIONS by All Plaintiffs. (Mergo, Nikole)
October 5, 2020 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Brandon Bundren on behalf of Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Bundren, Russell)
October 5, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 3.01(g) by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC re #160 MOTION to Exclude or Limit Defendants' Damages Expert, C. Donald Wiggins (Mergo, Nikole) Modified docket text on 10/6/2020 (MEJ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 160 MOTION to Exclude or Limit Defendants' Damages Expert, C. Donald Wiggins by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Redacted Distler Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Redacted Distler Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Redacted Distler Rebuttal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Redacted Wiggins Transcript)(Mergo, Nikole) Modified docket text on 9/29/2020 (MEJ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION to Seal to Exhibits 1, 3, and 7 of #158 Motion to Exclude Opinion of Carrie L. Distler by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified docket text on 9/29/2020 (MEJ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 158 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Carrie L. Distler by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- May 8, 2020 Report of Carrie L. Distler, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Supplemental Appendix B to May Report, #3 Exhibit 3 -- July 8, 2020 Rebuttal Report of Carrie L. Distler, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Excerpts from Deposition Transcript of Carrie L. Distler, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Excerpts from Deposition of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Designee, #6 Exhibit 6 -- Report of Clark C. Walton, #7 Exhibit 7 -- Supplemental Schedule 2.3 to May Report)(Nokes, Scarlett) Modified docket text on 9/29/2020 (MEJ).
August 27, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Conduct mediation hearing by 10/17/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (MEJ)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to conduct mediation is extended up to and including October 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/26/2020. (MKH)
August 26, 2020 Filing 156 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by All Plaintiffs. (Cluverius, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy Lynn Judkins terminated as counsel for Defendant Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/21/2020. (MKH)
August 21, 2020 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION for Amy L. Judkins to Withdraw as Attorney by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. (Judkins, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. R. Brandon Bundren, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendants U.S. Compounding, Inc. and Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation with Diana N. Evans, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/10/2020. (MKH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for R. Brandon Bundren to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17147693 for $150 by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Evans, Diana) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc., #121 Memorandum in opposition filed by Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. On or before August 14, 2020, the parties shall be required to submit paper copies of these filings and related exhibits to the chambers of the undersigned. See PDF Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/4/2020. (MKH)
July 31, 2020 Filing 150 SURREPLY re #144 Reply to Response to Motion, #139 Response to order to show cause, #131 Order to show cause filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Nokes, Scarlett) Modified on 8/3/2020 (MEJ).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AMENDED ORDER amending #148 Order on Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/31/2020. (MKH) (MKH).
July 31, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 8/26/2020 (MEJ)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #147 Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadline. The Damages Expert Discovery Deadline is extended up to and including August 26, 2020, for the sole purpose of conducting the deposition of Carrie L. Distler, Plaintiffs' designated expert. No other deadlines are extended by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/30/2020. (MKH)
July 29, 2020 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expert Discovery) by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
July 28, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Surreply Brief due by 7/31/2020. (MEJ)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #145 Motion to Exclude Exhibit to Reply... or in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Surreply. Defendants U.S. Compounding Inc. and Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation may file a sur-reply brief, not to exceed two (2) pages, on or before July 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/27/2020. (MKH)
July 27, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION to Exclude Exhibit A to Reply (Doc. 144-1) or in the Alternative, MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nokes, Scarlett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 7/28/2020 (MEJ).
July 20, 2020 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re #129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: E-mail Exchanges between Counsel for the Parties)(Cluverius, Jennifer)
July 14, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of compliance re #138 Order on Motion to Seal by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Mergo, Nikole)
July 14, 2020 Sealed Document (S-142). (DMA)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #140 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/13/2020. (MKH)
July 10, 2020 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply re #139 Response to Order to Show Cause by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 7/13/2020 (MEJ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 139 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #131 Order to show cause filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Nokes, Scarlett)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Seal. See PDF Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/7/2020. (MKH)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ENDORSED ORDER granting #135 Motion to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/7/2020. (LAM)
July 7, 2020 Filing 135 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages re. Response to Order to Show Cause (Doc. 131) by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
July 6, 2020 Sealed Document S-137. (MEJ)
July 6, 2020 Filing 134 Renewed and Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Defendants' counsel's correspondence dated 06-28-2020, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - June 29 email chain among counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - minimally-redacted Lane deposition transcript)(Cluverius, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 7/7/2020 (ARJ).
July 6, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Filing and NOTICE of Compliance re #132 Order on Motion to Seal by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Mergo, Nikole) Modified on 7/7/2020 (ARJ).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #128 Motion to Seal. See PDF Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/30/2020. (MKH)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER for Defendants to show cause why the motion #129 should not be granted and sanctions imposed. Show Cause Response due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/29/2020. (LAM)
June 28, 2020 Filing 130 RESPONSE to Motion re #128 Unopposed MOTION to Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support of Sealing filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nokes, Scarlett)
June 27, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Adjudged In Civil Contempt For Failure To Comply With The Consent Preliminary Injuction And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit Transcript of the Deposition of Jessica Lane, #3 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts of Deposition of Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, #4 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts from Deposition of Clay Guinn, #5 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts from Deposition of Gus Fernandez, #6 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts from Deposition of Robert Hopkins, #7 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts from Deposition of David Marguglio, #8 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts from Deposition of Susan Duell, #9 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts from Deposition of Patricia Fitzmaurice, #10 Exhibit Subpoena to Produce Documents issued to Jessica Lane (Lane Ex. 2), #11 Exhibit Resume of Jessica Lane (Lane Ex. 3), #12 Exhibit Employee Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure Agreement signed by Jessica Lane (Lane Ex. 4), #13 Exhibit Text messages between Jessica Lane and Shelly Hulsey (Lane Ex. 6), #14 Exhibit Email from Jessica Lane to Clay Guinn 10/28/18 (Lane Ex. 12), #15 Exhibit Email from Clay Guinn to Jessica Lane 10/24/18 (Lane Ex. 13), #16 Exhibit Email from Jessica Lane to Clay Guinn 11/19/18 (Lane Ex. 14), #17 Exhibit Emails between Jessica Lane and Shelly Hulsey 11/19/18, #18 Exhibit Emails between Jessica Lane, Hulsey, and Glenn Hogue 11/19/18 (Lane Ex. 16), #19 Exhibit Email from Jessica Lane to Shelly Hulsey and Glenn Hogue 11/20/18 (Lane Ex. 17), #20 Exhibit Email from Jessica Lane to Shelly Hulsey, Glenn Hogue, and Clay Guinn 11/20/18 (Lane Ex. 18), #21 Exhibit Nephron Contract Pricing Contract with customer (Lane Ex. 19), #22 Exhibit Nephron Contract Pricing Contract with customer (Lane Ex. 20), #23 Exhibit Email from Jessica Lane to Shelly Hulsey 12/5/18 (Lane Ex. 24), #24 Exhibit Email from Clay Guinn to Jessica Lane, Shelly Hulsey, and Glenn Hogue 12/5/18 (Lane Ex. 25), #25 Exhibit Emails between Shelly Hulsey, Clay Guinn, Jessica Lane, and Glenn Hogue 12/5/18 (Lane Ex. 26), #26 Exhibit Emails between Shelly Hulsey, Clay Guinn, Jessica Lane, and Glenn Hogue 12/5/18 (Lane Ex. 27), #27 Exhibit Emails between Shelly Hulsey, Clay Guinn, Jessica Lane, and Glenn Hogue beginning 12/5/18 (Lane Ex. 28), #28 Exhibit Nephron Contract Pricing Contract with customer (Lane Ex. 29), #29 Exhibit Nephron Contract Pricing Contract with customer (Lane Ex. 30), #30 Exhibit Email from Clay Guinn to Glenn Hogue, Shelly Hulsey, Jessica Lane, Rodney Hancock, and Randy Turner 12/14/18 (Lane Ex. 32), #31 Exhibit Email from Clay Guinn to Glenn Hogue, Shelly Hulsey, and Jessica Lane 12/19/18 (Lane Ex. 33), #32 Exhibit Email from David Fineberg to Jessica Lane 7/23/18 (Lane Ex. 34), #33 Exhibit Emails between Jessica Lane, Clay Guinn, Shelly Hulsey 1/2/19 (Lane Ex. 35), #34 Exhibit Email from Clay Guinn to Shelly Hulsey, Jessica Lane, and Glenn Hogue 1/24/19 (Lane Ex. 36), #35 Exhibit Email from Glenn Hogue to Clay Guinn, Shelly Hulsey, Jessica Lane, Randy Turner, Rodney Hancock, and others 1/28/19 (Lane Ex. 37), #36 Exhibit Emails between Jessica Lane, Glen Hogue, Clay Guinn, Shelly Hulsey, Randy Turner, Rodney Hancock, and others 1/28/19 (Lane Ex. 38), #37 Exhibit Emails between Jessica Lane, Clay Guinn, Shelly Hulsey, Glenn Hogue, and others beginning 1/28/19 (Lane Ex. 40), #38 Exhibit Email from Jessica Lane to Clay Guinn 2/27/19 (Lane Ex. 43), #39 Exhibit Emails between Clay Guinn, Kalli Skaggs, and Jessica Lane beginning 3/7/19 (Lane Ex. 44), #40 Exhibit Nephron Account 503(B) Utilization Form (Lane Ex. 45), #41 Exhibit Emails between Clay Guinn and Gus Fernandez and others 6/18/18 (Fernandez Ex. 14), #42 Exhibit Emails between Clay Guinn and Gus Fernandez beginning 6/19/18 (Fernandez Ex. 15), #43 Exhibit Emails between Dawn Bramlett, Robert Hopkins, David Marguglio, and Gus Fernandez beginning 10/10/18 (Fernandez Ex. 66), #44 Exhibit Emails between Susan Duell, Clay Guinn, and Gus Fernandez 10/23/18 (Fernandez Ex. 69), #45 Exhibit Emails between Gus Fernandez, Susan Duell, and Clay Guinn 10/23/18 (Fernandez Ex. 70), #46 Exhibit Emails between Clay Guinn, Gus Fernandez, Shelly Hulsey, and Jessica Lane beginning 9/6/18 (Guinn Ex. 54), #47 Exhibit Emails between Clay Guinn, Gus Fernandez, Jessica Lane and others beginning 11/20/18 (Guinn Ex. 66), #48 Exhibit Email from Clay Guinn to Glenn Hogue, Shelly Hulsey, and Jessica Lane 12/19/18 (Guinn Ex. 73), #49 Exhibit Letter from Clay Guinn to Rob Hopkins and Gus Fernandez 12/27/18 (Guinn Ex. 74), #50 Exhibit Emails between Jessica Lane, Clay Guinn, Shelly Hulsey, and others beginning 1/28/19 (Guinn Ex. 78), #51 Exhibit Emails between Clay Guinn, Kalli Skaggs, and Jessica Lane beginning 3/7/19 (Guinn Ex. 81), #52 Exhibit Emails between Rob Hopkins and Clay Guinn 12/14/18 (Hopkins Ex. 16), #53 Exhibit Emails between Clay Guinn, Rob Hopkins, and others beginning 1/8/19 (Hopkins Ex. 18), #54 Exhibit Email from Clay Guinn to Dawn Bramlett and Rob Hopkins 2/4/19 (Hopkins Ex. 20), #55 Exhibit Edited Transcript of ADMP earnings conference call or presentation 11/12/19 (Hopkins Ex. 32), #56 Exhibit 11/8/19 Correspondence to Jessica Lane Serving Subpoenas, #57 Exhibit 10/28/19 Counsel Email Chain Re Jessica Lane, #58 Exhibit 11/1/19 Counsel Email Chain Re Lane Acceptance of Service, #59 Exhibit 11/11/2019 Counsel Email Chain Re Jessica Lane, #60 Exhibit 12/23/19 Nexsen Pruet Correspondence to Bradley, #61 Exhibit 1/3/20 Bradley Correspondence to Nexsen Pruet in response to 12/23/19 Letter, #62 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant U.S. Compounding, Inc. dated 11/21/18)(Cluverius, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2020: #63 Deposition of Jessica Lane) (RDO).
June 26, 2020 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION to Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support of Sealing by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Cluverius, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 25, 2020 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENDORSED ORDER granting #125 Motion to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/25/2020. (LAM)
June 24, 2020 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages re. Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
June 22, 2020 Sealed Document S-124. (MEJ)
June 22, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of compliance re #122 Order on Motion to Seal by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Mergo, Nikole)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Seal. On or before June 22, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file under seal with the Clerk of Court Exhibits N, Q, R, T, X, Z, AA, CC, DD, and II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/15/2020. (MKH)
June 12, 2020 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #107 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A - Transcript of the Deposition of Nephron's Rule 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative, #3 Exhibit B - Transcript of the Deposition of Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, #4 Exhibit C - Transcript of the Deposition of Clay Guinn, #5 Exhibit D - Transcript of the Deposition of Gus Fernandez, #6 Exhibit E - Trade Secret Misappropriation Summary, #7 Exhibit F - Nephron's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Nephron 30(b)(6) Deposition Exhibit 14), #8 Exhibit G - Expert Report of Carrie L. Distler (Nephron's damages expert), #9 Exhibit H - Preliminary Expert Report of Clark C. Walton, Esq., #10 Exhibit I - Collective Nephron Policies Related to Confidentiality (Conflicts of Interest; Communications Systems; Handbook), #11 Exhibit J - 7/2/18 Email from Fernandez to Guinn, #12 Exhibit K - 6/18/18 Email from Guinn to Fernandez (Fernandez Ex. 14), #13 Exhibit L - 7/10/18 Email from Guinn to Fernandez (Guinn Ex. 22), #14 Exhibit M - 8/17/18 Email from Fernandez to Guinn, #15 Exhibit N - 5/21/18 Email from Guinn to Fernandez (Guinn Ex. 10), #16 Exhibit O - 1/24/19 Email from Guinn to Hulsey and others, #17 Exhibit P - 6/17/18 Email from Dennis Carlo to multiple parties (Duell Ex. 3), #18 Exhibit Q - 7/13/18 Email from Guinn to Fernandez (Fernandez Ex. 36), #19 Exhibit R - 8/20/18 Email from Kendra Williams to Guinn (Guinn Ex. 37), #20 Exhibit S - 8/24/18 Email from Guinn to Hulsey (Guinn Ex. 42), #21 Exhibit T - Table of Emails Sent from Hulsey's USC Email Account (Hulsey Ex. 54), #22 Exhibit U - 9/6/18 Email from Guinn to Hulsey (Hulsey Ex. 62), #23 Exhibit V - 6/14/18 Email from Guinn to Fernandez, #24 Exhibit W - Internet Explorer Main History- Hulsey's Nephron Computer (Hulsey Ex. 14) (Exhibit B-6 to Walton Report), #25 Exhibit X - Exemplar Summary from Customer Summary Compilation, #26 Exhibit Y - Hulsey's Confidential & Non-Disclosure Agreement ("NDA") (30(b)(6) Exhibit 5), #27 Exhibit Z - Jump List- Hulsey's Personal Computer, #28 Exhibit AA - Jump List- Todd Johnson's Personal Computer (Hulsey Fianc) (Hulsey Ex. 73) (Exhibit J-1 to Walton Report), #29 Exhibit BB - 9/10/18 Second Cease-and-Desist Letter to Hulsey (Hulsey Ex. 63), #30 Exhibit CC - 6/22/18 Email from Hulsey attaching Customer Contact List (Hulsey Ex. 40), #31 Exhibit DD - Chrome Web Visits- Hulsey's Nephron Computer (Hulsey Ex. 41) (Exhibit B-3 to Walton Report), #32 Exhibit EE - USB Devices- Hulsey's Nephron Computer (Hulsey Ex. 44) (Exhibit B-13 to Walton Report), #33 Exhibit FF - USB Devices- Hulsey's USC Computer, #34 Exhibit GG - Cloud Service URLs- Hulsey's USC Computer, #35 Exhibit HH - 8/21/18 Email from Guinn to Brian Mitchell (Guinn Ex. 41), #36 Exhibit II - Seagate File Listing (Hulsey's Personal External Hard Drive) (Hulsey Ex. 16) (Exhibit E to Walton Report), #37 Exhibit JJ - Recycle Bin- Hulsey's Nephron Computer (Hulsey Ex. 53), #38 Exhibit KK - 7/26/18 Email from Hulsey to Duell and Guinn, #39 Exhibit LL - 8/27/18 Exemplar Email from Hulsey to Nephron Customers (Hulsey Ex. 55))(Mergo, Nikole)
June 12, 2020 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION to Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support of Sealing Pursuant to Fla. Stat. Ann. 688.006 and 28 U.S.C. 1835(A) by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying #112 Motion to Strike ; granting #116 Motion to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/11/2020. (LAM)
June 10, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE of Filing and Compliance with Court Order Doc. #114 by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #108 Statement of undisputed facts (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19)(Nokes, Scarlett) Modified on 6/11/2020 (SPM).
June 10, 2020 Sealed Document S-117. (MEJ)
June 9, 2020 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages For Plaintiffs' Opposition to #107 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole) Modified on 6/10/2020 (SPM).
May 29, 2020 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION to Strike #108 Statement of undisputed facts, #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #109 Motion to Seal. See Order for details and further requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/28/2020. (MKH)
May 26, 2020 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion re #109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 12 (Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Interrogatories), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Excerpts from the Deposition of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Representative), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (June 2018 emails between Hulsey, Fernandez, and Guinn regarding Hulsey's sales), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (June 2018 emails between Hulsey and Guinn regarding Hulsey sales), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 10 (July 2018 emails between Hulsey, Fernandez, and Guinn regarding Hulsey's potential employment with USC), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (July 5, 2018 email from Fernandez to Hulsey and Guinn regarding Hulsey's potential compensation at USC), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 13 (contracts between Plaintiffs and its customers), #11 Exhibit Part I -Exhibit 14 (a contract between Plaintiffs and a customer), #12 Exhibit Part II - Exhibit 14 (a contract between Plaintiffs and a customer), #13 Exhibit Exhibit 15 (August 27, 2018 email between Hulsey and prospective USC customer), #14 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Excerpts from the Deposition of Defendant Hulsey), #15 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Excerpts from the Deposition of Clay Guinn), #16 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Excerpts from the Deposition of Gus Fernandez), #17 Exhibit (May 18, 2018 email from Guinn to Fernandez), #18 Exhibit (June 28, 2018 email from Hulsey to Fernandez attaching a list of Hulsey's "pretty good accounts"), #19 Exhibit Exhibit 16 (Excerpts from the Deposition of Robert Hopkins), #20 Exhibit Emails Among Counsel Regarding Meet and Confer)(Mergo, Nikole)
May 15, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION to Strike #108 Statement of undisputed facts, #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Cluverius, Jennifer)
May 12, 2020 Set deadlines as to #109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal . Plaintiff Responses due by 5/26/2020 (ARJ)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re #109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal. On or before May 26, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion to seal addressing the issues outlined in this Order. See PDF Order for additional requirements and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/12/2020. (MKH)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MILBURN ORDER re #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. Plaintiffs will be allowed until June 12, 2020, to file responsive memoranda. Defendants may file a reply brief, not exceeding ten (10) pages, within fourteen (14) days after the response is served. The parties shall electronically file all exhibits in support of their papers. The parties will be advised if paper copies of any or all exhibits will be required. The Court prefers transcripts in full-page format. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/7/2020. (LAM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Nokes, Scarlett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
May 6, 2020 Filing 108 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Nokes, Scarlett)
May 6, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
April 27, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Status Report due by 5/8/2020. (MEJ)
April 24, 2020 Filing 106 STATUS report Regarding Pending Bankruptcy Proceeding by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER directing compliance. Plaintiffs have failed to comply with the Court's order of October 16, 2019 directing counsel to file a status report of the pending bankruptcy case of Jennifer Shelly Hulsey on or before April 15, 2020, and every six months thereafter.Plaintiffs are therefore directed to file a report with the court by May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/24/2020. (LAM)
March 26, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 8/20/2020, Dispositive motions due by 5/6/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/8/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/8/2020 (MEJ)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ENDORSED ORDER granting #103 Motion to extend certain case management deadlines. The deadlines are extended as requested in the motion. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/25/2020. (LAM)
March 24, 2020 Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extension of Deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Nokes, Scarlett) Modified on 3/25/2020 (MEJ).
February 12, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 3/2/2020, Dispositive motions due by 4/6/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/8/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/8/2020 (MEJ)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/11/2020. (MKH)
February 10, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney James A. Byars, appearing on behalf of Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL088824.) Related document: #99 MOTION for James A. Byars to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
February 6, 2020 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Extend Case Management Deadlines by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 motion to appear pro hac vice. James A. Byars, Esq. may specially appear in this case as counsel for Plaintiffs with Jaclyn S. Clark, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/6/2020. (MKH)
February 6, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION for James A. Byars to appear pro hac vice by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Jaclyn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/12/2019. (MKH)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying as moot #93 Motion to Quash. Defendant Jennifer Shelly Hulsey has withdrawn the motion. See Doc. 96. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/12/2019. (MKH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey re #93 MOTION to Quash Subpoena For Her Deposition to Testify in a Civil Action, or in the Alternative, For a Protective Order filed by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey (Myers, James)
November 11, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION to extend time to Comply with #92 Order on Motion to Compel by U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett) Modified on 11/12/2019 (RDO).
November 5, 2019 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of service by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey . (Myers, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION to Quash Subpoena For Her Deposition to Testify in a Civil Action, or in the Alternative, For a Protective Order by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Myers, James) Modified on 11/5/2019 (BIA).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #87 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant U.S. Compounding, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/29/2019. (MKH)
October 16, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Status Report due by 4/15/2020. (RDO)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ENDORSED AMENDED ORDER amending #90 Order staying case and directing status reports. The order is amended only to correct a scrivener's error. The deadline to file the first status report is April 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/16/2019. (LAM)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re #89 Notice of bankruptcy filing by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Jennifer Shelly Hulsey are automatically STAYED. Plaintiffs are directed to file and serve a status report regarding the pending bankruptcy on or before April 15, 2019, and every six months thereafter until the bankruptcy proceeding is resolved or the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/15/2019. (LAM)
October 14, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Bankruptcy filing by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey (Myers, James) Modified on 10/15/2019 (RDO).
October 4, 2019 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant U.S. Compounding, Inc. filed by U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Nokes, Scarlett)
September 20, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant U.S. Compounding, Inc. by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Clark, Jaclyn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
September 6, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #74 Amended Complaint by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey.(Furbush, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time to respond re #74 Amended Complaint. Jennifer Shelly Hulsey response due 9/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/4/2019. (MKH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #74 Amended Complaint by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc..(Nokes, Scarlett)
September 3, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Third Amended Complaint by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. (Myers, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #75 motion to dismiss; granting #76 motion to dismiss. The Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 75 and 76) are GRANTED. Counts IV, V, VI, and VIII of the Third Amended Complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/19/2019. (MAF)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ENDORSED ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/31/2019. (Presnell, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Filing 80 Consent MOTION for leave to file Out of Time Response in Opposition to #76 Motion to Dismiss By Defendant Jennifer Shelly Hulsey by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Clark, Jaclyn) Modified on 7/31/2019 (RDO).
July 30, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of filing Exhibit A to #77 Memorandum in opposition, #78 Memorandum in opposition by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. . (Clark, Jaclyn) Modified on 7/30/2019 (LMM).
July 30, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in opposition re #76 Motion to dismissMotion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Jaclyn) Modified on 7/31/2019 (RDO).
July 29, 2019 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #75 Motion to dismiss filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comparison of Second Amended Complaint to Third Amended Complaint)(Clark, Jaclyn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV, VI, VIII of PlaintiffsThird Amended Complaint by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. (Furbush, Michael) Modified on 7/16/2019 (LMM).
July 15, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Verified Complaint by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
July 1, 2019 Filing 74 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Houston, Mary) Modified on 7/2/2019 (LMM).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #65 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 62 and 65) are GRANTED. Counts IV, V, VI, and VIII of the Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice. If the Plaintiffs wish to file a third amended complaint, they may do so within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/10/2019. (MAF)
May 29, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 2/17/2020, Pretrial statement due by 11/15/2020, All other motions due by 11/30/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 10/1/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/2/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 11/29/2019 (LMM)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/28/2019. (TKW)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER granting #70 Motion for extension of deadlines in the case management and scheduling order. An amended CMO will be docketed separately. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/28/2019. (TKW)
May 24, 2019 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for extension of Deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Houston, Mary) Modified on 5/28/2019 (LMM).
May 6, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Houston, Mary)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 motion to appear pro hac vice. James D. Myers, Esq. and Rachael D. Longhofer, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendant Jennifer Shelly Hulsey with Michael J. Furbush, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/25/2019. (MKH)
April 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney James Myers, appearing on behalf of Jennifer Shelly Hulsey (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL082214.) Related document: #67 Unopposed MOTION for James Myers and Rachael Longhofer to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
April 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Rachael Longhofer, appearing on behalf of Jennifer Shelly Hulsey (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL082214.) Related document: #67 Unopposed MOTION for James Myers and Rachael Longhofer to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
April 24, 2019 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for James Myers and Rachael Longhofer to appear pro hac vice by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Furbush, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
April 23, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE to counsel, James D. Myers, Rachael D. Longhofer, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LMM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. (Furbush, Michael)
April 8, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim as to Second Amended Verified Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Houston, Mary)
April 4, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #28 Interested persons order by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Adamis Corporation, Other Affiliate Biosyn, Inc. for Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.. (Evans, Diana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim as to Second Amended Verified Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Mehta, Jason)
March 25, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc.. Answer due by 5:00 p.m. 3/25/2019. (LMM)
March 25, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. Answer due by 4/22/2019. (LMM)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #60 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/22/2019. (MKH)
March 21, 2019 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond re #52 Amended Complaint , Unopposed MOTION for Jason P. Mehta, Diana N. Evans, Scarlett S. Nokes to withdraw as attorney for Jennifer Shelly Hulsey by U.S. Compounding Inc., Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Jennifer Shelly Hulsey. (Evans, Diana) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 3/22/2019 (LMM).
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENDORSED ORDER. Upon consideration of the #56 Response to order to show cause filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, U.S. Compounding Inc., Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, it is ORDERED that the show cause order #53 is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/15/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond re #52 Amended Complaint. Answer or response due 3/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/15/2019. (MKH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by All Defendants. (Evans, Diana) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
March 14, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #53 Order to show cause filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Nokes, Scarlett)
March 14, 2019 Filing 55 SUMMONS issued as to Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (AC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 54 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Houston, Mary)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER for Attorney Scarlett Nokes to show cause why her pro hac vice status should not be revoked for failure to comply with the Court's order regarding electronic filing. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/6/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM) Modified on 3/18/2019 (LMM). *DISCHARGED PER 59 ORDER**
March 1, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc., Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Houston, Mary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 51 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:18-cv-1573-Orl-31LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2019. (MAF)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 motion to amend/correct. For good cause, and in light of the parties' consent, the Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend its Amended Complaint. The Court also GRANTS the Plaintiffs' Motion to Add Adamis as a named Defendant who is explicitly subject to the Consent Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 29). The Plaintiffs may file their second amended complaint, and the Consent Preliminary Injunction #29 is hereby AMENDED to include Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation as a named defendant to whom the Preliminary Injunction applies. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2019. (MAF)
February 28, 2019 Filing 48 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct its Amended Complaint and Add Adamis as a Named Defendant in the Consent Preliminary Injunction, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Houston, Mary)
January 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Scarlett Nokes, appearing on behalf of Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL079906.) Related document: #45 Amended MOTION for Scarlett Nokes to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
January 11, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Houston, Mary)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AND DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Scarlett Nokes, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendants with Diana N. Evans, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/11/2019. (ECJ)
January 10, 2019 Filing 45 Amended MOTION for Scarlett Nokes to appear pro hac vice by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Evans, Diana) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying without prejudice #43 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/10/2019. (ECJ)
January 10, 2019 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Scarlett Nokes to appear pro hac vice by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Evans, Diana) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
December 28, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Mehta, Jason)
December 14, 2018 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified against Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Houston, Mary)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. All Defendants. The Motion to Dismiss at Doc. 38 is hereby terminated. Defendants' response to the Complaint is due by December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/29/2018. (TKW)
November 28, 2018 Filing 39 Consent MOTION to Withdraw #38 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/12/18 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Mehta, Jason) Modified on 11/29/2018 (JET).
November 19, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Mehta, Jason)
November 15, 2018 Filing 37 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Matt G. Firestone appointed as Mediator. (LMM)
November 15, 2018 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2019, Discovery due by 8/16/2019, Dispositive motions due by 9/16/2019, Joint Final Pretrial statement due by 5/15/2020, All other motions due by 5/29/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Trial term begins 7/1/2020 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/1/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/31/2019 (LMM)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/14/2018. (TKW)
November 9, 2018 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mehta, Jason)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to modify and paragraph (e) of the Consent Preliminary Injunction is modified accordingly. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/26/2018. (TKW)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to modify Consent Preliminary Injunction by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Mehta, Jason)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Consent Motion to Permit Telephone Attendance at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/22/2018. (ECJ) Modified on 10/23/2018 (ECJ).
October 22, 2018 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference and Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Houston, Mary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
October 19, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #28 Interested persons order by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Mehta, Jason)
October 15, 2018 Filing 29 CONSENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/15/2018. (TKW)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendants. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/15/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
October 14, 2018 Reset deadlines: for All Defendants. Answer due by 11/19/2018. (ALL)
October 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond to #1 Complaint. New deadline: November 19, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/14/2018. (Spaulding, Karla)
October 12, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Mehta, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
October 10, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for 10/11/2018 (ctp) (JLC)
October 10, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Consent Preliminary Injunction by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Consent Preliminary Injunction)(Houston, Mary) Modified on 10/11/2018 (JET).
October 8, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc.. (Mehta, Jason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Houston, Mary)
October 8, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. Related case(s): No (Houston, Mary) Modified on 10/9/2018 (LMM).
October 5, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Page to #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Attachments: #1 Corrected Page)(Houston, Mary) Modified on 10/5/2018 (LMM).
October 1, 2018 Filing 19 Affidavit of service of #12 ORDER, #13 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, 14 Notice of Hearing as to U.S. Compounding on 9/27/18 by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Houston, Mary) Modified on 10/2/2018 (LMM).
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Compounding on 9/26/18 by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Houston, Mary) Modified on 10/2/2018 (LMM).
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of compliance with #15 Order Dated September 27, 2018 by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Houston, Mary) Modified on 10/1/2018 (LMM).
September 28, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jennifer S. Cluverius, appearing on behalf of Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077249.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Nikole S. Mergo and Jennifer S Cluverius to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
September 28, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nikole Setzler Mergo, appearing on behalf of Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL077249.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Nikole S. Mergo and Jennifer S Cluverius to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nikole Setzler Mergo, Esq. and Jennifer S. Cluverius, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Plaintiff with Mary Ruth Houston, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/27/2018. (ECJ)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Plaintiffs' counsel shall serve on Defendants the following: #12 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC, #13 Temporary Restraining Order, #1 Complaint filed by Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/27/2018. (TKW)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (ctp)(JLC)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/26/2018. (CAC)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/26/2018. (CAC)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Nikole S. Mergo and Jennifer S Cluverius to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Houston, Mary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 9/24/18 by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC as to Jennifer Shelly Hulsey (Houston, Mary) Modified on 9/27/2018 (LMM).
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED Rule 65 Certification by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. Amendment to #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Houston, Mary) Modified on 9/25/2018 (LMM).
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Houston, Mary)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Houston, Mary)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/24/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/24/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Nikole S. Mergo, Esq. and Jennifer S. Cluverius, Esq. of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc. (Issued at Intake). (BIA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Verification of Henry J. Jibaja, Jr. filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC re #1 Complaint (BIA) Modified on 9/21/2018 (BIA).
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Preliminary Injunction Requested) against Jennifer Shelly Hulsey, U.S. Compounding Inc., with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-77086) filed by Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nephron S.C., Inc., Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al v. Hulsey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nephron Sterile Compounding Center LLC
Represented By: Jaclyn Sara Clark
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Represented By: Jennifer S. Cluverius
Represented By: James A. Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nephron S.C., Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn Sara Clark
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Represented By: Jennifer S. Cluverius
Represented By: James A. Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nephron Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Jaclyn Sara Clark
Represented By: Mary Ruth Houston
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Represented By: Jennifer S. Cluverius
Represented By: James A. Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Shelly Hulsey
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Represented By: Diana Nicole Evans
Represented By: Scarlett Nokes
Represented By: Amy Lynn Judkins
Represented By: James D. Myers
Represented By: Michael J. Furbush
Represented By: Rachael D. Longhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Compounding Inc.
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Represented By: Diana Nicole Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Compounding Inc. doing business as U.S. Compounding Pharmacy
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Represented By: Diana Nicole Evans
Represented By: Arthur Lee Bentley, III
Represented By: Scarlett Nokes
Represented By: Russell Brandon Bundren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Represented By: Diana Nicole Evans
Represented By: Arthur Lee Bentley, III
Represented By: Russell Brandon Bundren
Represented By: Scarlett Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?