United States of America v. Real Property Located at 6741 Sorrenton Street, Orlando, FL, 32819
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 6741 Sorrenton Street, Orlando, FL, 32819 and Real Property Located at 6741 Sorrento Street, Orlando, FL, 32819
Claimant: Scott Randolph
Case Number: 6:2018cv01803
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America re #8 Claim recognizing interest of orange county tax collector (Muench, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 VERIFIED CLAIM OF LIEN of Scott Randolph Orange County Tax Collector. (Paasch, Michael) Modified on 12/7/2018 (DMA).
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 US Marshal 285 form for Post and Walk of Notice and Verified Complaint on 11/5/2018. (DMA)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Muench, James)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/30/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/30/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Muench, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (DMA)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Real Property Located at 6741 Sorrento Street, Orlando, FL, 32819 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 6741 Sorrenton Street, Orlando, FL, 32819
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 6741 Sorrenton Street, Orlando, FL, 32819
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 6741 Sorrento Street, Orlando, FL, 32819
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James A. Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Scott Randolph
Represented By: Michael A. Paasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?