Ecolab Inc. et al v. International Chemical Corporation
Plaintiff: Ecolab Inc. and Ecolab USA Inc.
Defendant: International Chemical Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv01910
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by International Chemical Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Wimberly, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant by 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/21/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by International Chemical Corporation. (Wimberly, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Wimberly on behalf of International Chemical Corporation (Wimberly, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lewis Wolter on behalf of International Chemical Corporation (Wolter, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber N. Davis on behalf of International Chemical Corporation (Davis, Amber)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/28/18 by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc. as to International Chemical Corporation. (Gilchrist, Brian)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 COMPLAINT (Unredacted) against International Chemical Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from 10-1208, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Judgment from 10-1208, #3 Exhibit C - Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Dry Trac Website, #5 Exhibit E - Letter to Catroneo, #6 Exhibit F - Email from Catroneo, #7 Exhibit G - '257 Patent, #8 Exhibit H - '381 Patent, #9 Exhibit I - '215 Patent, #10 Exhibit J - "838 Patent, #11 Exhibit K - '984 Patent, #12 Exhibit L - '409 Patent, #13 Exhibit M - '648 Patent, #14 Exhibit N - Registration for DRYEXX, #15 Exhibit O - Registration for INSPEXX, #16 Exhibit P - Registration for MATRIXX, #17 Exhibit Q - Registration for QUADEXX)(Gilchrist, Brian) Modified on 11/27/2018 (SPM).
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc.. (Gilchrist, Brian)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc.. Related case(s): Yes. (Gilchrist, Brian) Modified on 11/15/2018 (SPM).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER denying 2 PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF THEIR COMPLAINT AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SAME for failure to comply with Judge Kelly's Standing Order Regarding Motions to Seal or Redact, Case No. 6:18-mc-22-Orl-GJK, which can be found on the Court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/14/2018. (MB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:18-cv-1910-Orl-41GJK. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. Motion 2 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to File Unredacted Versions of Complaint and Certain Exhibits Under Seal (with Memorandum of Law in Support) referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (MAA)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to the Honorable Gregory J. Kelly as the presiding Magistrate Judge, with his permission, for consideration with a related case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/13/2018. (ECJ)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/9/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/23/2018. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 11/9/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (SPM)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to International Chemical Corporation. (SPM)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:18-cv-1910-Orl-41KRS. (SJB)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against International Chemical Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14796964) filed by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from 10-1208, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Judgment from 10-1208, #3 Exhibit D - Dry Trac Website, #4 Exhibit E Redacted, Part 1 - Letter to Catroneo, #5 Exhibit E Redacted, Part 2 - Letter to Catroneo, #6 Exhibit E Redacted, Part 3 - Letter to Catroneo, #7 Exhibit F - Email from Catroneo, #8 Exhibit G - 257 Patent, #9 Exhibit H - 381 Patent, #10 Exhibit I - 215 Patent, #11 Exhibit J - 838 Patent, #12 Exhibit K - 984 Patent, #13 Exhibit L - 409 Patent, #14 Exhibit M - 648 Patent, #15 Exhibit N - Registration for DRYEXX, #16 Exhibit O - Registration for INSPEXX, #17 Exhibit P - Registration for MATRIXX, #18 Exhibit Q - Registration for QUADEXX, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Proposed Summons)(Gilchrist, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecolab Inc. et al v. International Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecolab Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Santurri
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecolab USA Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Santurri
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Represented By: Robert Lewis Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?