Tran v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Tuan Tran
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa, Florida, Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2018cv01985
Filed: November 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk to close this case in light of #9 Notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/5/2018. (BRS)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Tuan Tran (Stoller, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tuan Tran. (Stoller, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tuan Tran. Related case(s): yes (Stoller, David) Modified on 11/27/2018 (JET).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/20/2018. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants but no summonses provided for U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JET)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:18-cv-1985-Orl-28TBS. (SJB)
November 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet (attached) by Tuan Tran re #1 Complaint (Stoller, David) Modified on 11/19/2018 (JET).
November 17, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Tuan Tran. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Summons, USCIS Director, #2 Supplement Proposed Summons, USCIS District Director, #3 Supplement Proposed Supplement, USCIS Field Office Director)(Stoller, David)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Pending Application for Naturalization and/or Issuance of Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113A-14834643) filed by Tuan Tran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form N-400 Filing Receipt, #2 Exhibit Interview Notice, #3 Exhibit Form N-652, Interview Results, #4 Exhibit USCIS Web Portal Case Status, #5 Exhibit USCIS.gov Processing Report (Form N-400))(Stoller, David) Modified on 11/19/2018 (JET). See Civil Cover Sheet at #2 and Proposed Summonses at #3 .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuan Tran
Represented By: David Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?