Nirvana Health Services, Inc. v. Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Plaintiff: Nirvana Health Services, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Seema Verma, Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 6:2018cv02044
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/11/2019. (SCM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Alpha Home Health Solutions by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Posteraro, Julie)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/20/2018. (JRJ)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #12 Related Case Order by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Fischer, Matthew) Modified on 12/20/2018 (RDO).
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to #14 Response to Motion re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Nirvana Health Services, Inc. (Fischer, Matthew) Modified on 12/14/2018 (JET).
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Posteraro, Julie)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/5/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/5/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 4, 2018 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 2/3/2019. (RDO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Nirvana Health Services, Inc. of Service (Fischer, Matthew)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on December 3, 2018 by Nirvana Health Services, Inc. as to Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Fischer, Matthew)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; taking under advisement #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and setting briefing schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/29/2018. (JRJ)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(RDO)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II, Seema Verma filed by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fischer, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 FEES paid by Nirvana Health Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 113A-14864350) (SJB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:18-cv-2044-Orl-40DCI. (SJB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Fischer, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nirvana Health Services, Inc. v. Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nirvana Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Julie Posteraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Julie Posteraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?