Puerta v. Diversified I, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Maria Puerta
Defendant: Laila Sabry and Diversified I, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv02091
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Maria Puerta. (Leach, Carlos)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order to comply with Local rule per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria Puerta. Related case(s): no (Leach, Carlos)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/10/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER directing compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) by 12/24/18. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/10/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:18-cv-2091-Orl-41GJK. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Diversified I, LLC, Laila Sabry. (JET)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:18-cv-2091-Orl-28GJK. (SJB)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversified I, LLC, Laila Sabry with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113A-14893755) filed by Maria Puerta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons against Diversified I, #3 Proposed Summons against Sabry)(Leach, Carlos) Modified on 12/5/2018 (JET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puerta v. Diversified I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laila Sabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Puerta
Represented By: Carlos V. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?