United States of America v. Harden et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tamika Robenson, Yahaira Claudio, Erotida Harden, Certified Taxes, LLC, Aida Cortes, Natasha Williams and Michael Harden
Case Number: 6:2018cv02148
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 38 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Natasha Williams (SPM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Natasha Williams by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 1, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Robins, Samuel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #15 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Robins, Samuel) Modified on 2/1/2019 (SPM).
January 27, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #27 Interested persons order by Aida Cortes. (Meltzer, Brett)
January 27, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #23 Interested persons order by Certified Taxes, LLC. (Ramjeawan, Rudranath)
January 27, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #23 Interested persons order by Erotida Harden. (Ramjeawan, Rudranath)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #30 Order directing compliance. Upon the reopening of the government, the Parties have 14 days to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 16), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 15). Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/23/2019. (TNP)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 **DISCHARGED PER 31 ORDER** ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Orders directing Plaintiff to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 16), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 15). Defendants failed to comply with the Court's Order directing Defendants to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Docs. 23 and 27). Responses due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/23/2019. (DJD) Modified on 1/24/2019 (SPM).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/7/2019. (DJD)
January 3, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza: MOTION HEARING held on 1/3/2019 re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by United States of America. Plaintiff advises the Court they have reached an agreement with respect to the preliminary injunction with all defendants present. Court will issue preliminary injunction order against all defendants. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (DJD)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant Cortes by 1/17/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/3/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Ryan Meltzer on behalf of Aida Cortes (Meltzer, Brett)
January 2, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #4 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderOrder on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Yahaira Claudio. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 12/29/2018 by United States of America as to Yahaira Claudio. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendants Harden and Certified Taxes by 1/16/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/2/2019. (DJD) ctp
December 31, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Rudranath Rudy Ramjeawan on behalf of Certified Taxes, LLC (Ramjeawan, Rudranath)
December 31, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Rudranath Rudy Ramjeawan on behalf of Erotida Harden (Ramjeawan, Rudranath)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of service on Certified Taxes, LLC, by United States of America re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #4 Order . (Applegate, Daniel) Modified on 12/31/2018 (JET).
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of service on Erotida Harden by United States of America re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #4 Order . (Applegate, Daniel) Modified on 12/31/2018 (JET).
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 12/28/2018 by United States of America as to Certified Taxes, LLC. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 12/28/2018 by United States of America as to Erotida Harden. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/28/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/11/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of service on Aida Cortes by United States of America re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #4 Order . (Applegate, Daniel) Modified on 12/31/2018 (JET).
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 12/27/2018 by United States of America as to Aida Cortes. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Motion for Preliminary Injunction hearing previously scheduled for January 3, 2019 is rescheduled. New hearing time: Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2019 at 08:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (DJD) ctp
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #4 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderOrder on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Natasha Williams. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #4 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderOrder on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Tamika Robenson. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of service by United States of America re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction , #4 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderOrder on Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Michael Harden. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 12/22/2018 by United States of America as to Natasha Williams. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 12/26/2018 by United States of America as to Tamika Robenson. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 12/22/2018 by United States of America as to Michael Harden. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Motion for Preliminary Injunction hearing previously scheduled for January 3, 2019 is rescheduled. New hearing time: Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (DJD) ctp
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for temporary restraining order; Ruling deferred on #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff and Defendants shall appear on Thursday, January 3, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5B, before the Honorable Carlos E. Mendoza. See order for specific details regarding the restraining order. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/21/2018. (DJD)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order , MOTION for preliminary injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Revenue Agent Ricky Poole, #2 Declaration of Bhavinkumar Gheewala, #3 Declaration of Blake Chambers, #4 Declaration of Chaquetta James, #5 Declaration of Daniel Kuilan and Vanessa Ramirez Castera, #6 Declaration of Danielle Mauer Pelaez, #7 Declaration of Jamie O'Brien, #8 Declaration of Jorge Molina, #9 Declaration of Michael Rivera, #10 Declaration of Natasha Narain, #11 Declaration of Ramona Rodriguez Carrion, #12 Declaration of Robert Zuna, #13 Declaration of Victor Hassell, #14 Declaration of William Berry, #15 Exhibit A - Certified Taxes, LLC corporate filings, #16 Exhibit B - Maximum Tax Service, LLC articles of organization, #17 Exhibit C - IRS EFIN application summary and comments for Natasha Williams d/b/a Maximum Taxes, #18 Exhibit D - Dominic Pugh 2017 tax return, #19 Exhibit D-1 - Dominic Pugh 2017 wage and withholding information, #20 Exhibit E - Paulina Owens 2017 tax return, #21 Exhibit F - Shakevya Carson 2017 tax return, #22 Exhibit G - Brandon Thompson 2017 tax return, #23 Exhibit H - Malik Davis 2017 tax return, #24 Exhibit I - Atwood Mincy 2017 tax return, #25 Exhibit J - Brandi Mitchum 2016 tax return, #26 Exhibit K - Brandi Mitchum 2016 wage and withholding information, #27 Exhibit L - Noel Rivera 2016 tax return, #28 Exhibit M - Noel Rivera 2016 wage and withholding information, #29 Exhibit N - Schantell McKay 2016 tax return, #30 Exhibit O - Schantell McKay 2016 wage and withholding information, #31 Exhibit P - Donald Haney 2016 tax return, #32 Exhibit Q - Donald Haney 2016 wage and withholding information, #33 Exhibit R - Leticia Venegas 2016 tax return, #34 Exhibit S - Leticia Venegas 2016 wage and withholding information, #35 Exhibit T - Anissia Leonard 2016 tax return, #36 Exhibit U - Anissia Leonard 2016 wage and withholding information, #37 Exhibit V - Danielle Mauer Pelaez 2017 tax return, #38 Exhibit W - Robert Zuna 2016 tax return, #39 Exhibit X - Robert Zuna 2017 tax return, #40 Exhibit Y - Chequetta James 2017 tax return, #41 Exhibit Z - Natasha Narain 2016 tax return, #42 Exhibit AA - Natasha Narain 2017 tax return, #43 Exhibit BB - Ramona Rodriguez Carrion 2017 tax return, #44 Exhibit CC - William Berry 2016 tax return, #45 Exhibit DD - William Berry 2017 tax return, #46 Exhibit EE - Bhavinkumar Gheewala 2017 tax return, #47 Exhibit FF - Michael Rivera 2016 tax return, #48 Exhibit GG - Michael Rivera 2017 tax return, #49 Exhibit HH - Blake Chambers 2016 tax return, #50 Exhibit II - Blake Chambers 2017 tax return, #51 Exhibit JJ - Daniel Kulian and Vanessa Ramirez Castera 2016 tax return, #52 Exhibit KK - Daniel Kulian and Vanessa Ramirez Castera 2017 tax return, #53 Exhibit LL - Jamie O'Brien 2016 tax return, #54 Exhibit MM - Jamie O'Brien 2017 tax return, #55 Exhibit NN - Arturo Pelaez 2017 tax return, #56 Exhibit OO - Victor Hassell 2016 tax return, #57 Exhibit PP - Victor Hassell 2017 tax return, #58 Exhibit QQ - Jorge Molina 2017 tax return, #59 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #60 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction)(Applegate, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Certified Taxes, LLC, Yahaira Claudio, Aida Cortes, Erotida Harden, Michael Harden, Tamika Robenson, Natasha Williams. (SPM)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Certified Taxes, LLC, Yahaira Claudio, Aida Cortes, Erotida Harden, Michael Harden, Tamika Robenson, Natasha Williams filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Harden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamika Robenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahaira Claudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erotida Harden
Represented By: Rudranath Rudy Ramjeawan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Taxes, LLC
Represented By: Rudranath Rudy Ramjeawan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida Cortes
Represented By: Brett Ryan Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel A. Applegate
Represented By: Jared S. Wiesner
Represented By: Alison Austen Yewdell
Represented By: Samuel Peter Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?