United States of America v. Cornwell et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert A. Labella, Jr., Orange County Tax Collector, JOMICO, LLC, Dr. Philipps Community Association, Inc., Somerset Shores Homeowner's Association, Inc., Joseph D. Cornwell, Jr. and JOMICH
Case Number: 6:2018cv02194
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by United States of America. (Guerrier, Pascale)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to lift stay and extend deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/31/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America (construed as motion to lift stay) re #6 Order on motion to stay (Notice of Appropriations) (Guerrier, Pascale) Modified on 1/31/2019 (RMF).
January 2, 2019 Case Stayed. (RMF)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/2/2019.(KWH)
December 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to stay Deadlines Due to Lapse of Appropriations by United States of America. (Guerrier, Pascale)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/11/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/28/2018. (RMF)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (ALL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:18-cv-2194-Orl-22TBS. (SJB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons J.D. Cornwell, #3 Proposed Summons Dr. Phillips Comm, #4 Proposed Summons JOMICO, LLC, #5 Proposed Summons Robert A. Labella etc, #6 Proposed Summons Orange County, #7 Proposed Summons Somerset Shores, #8 Exhibit Exhibits A -D, #9 Exhibit Notice of Lis Pendens)(Guerrier, Pascale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cornwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Labella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOMICO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Philipps Community Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somerset Shores Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Cornwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOMICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Pascale Guerrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?