Couch et al v. Wyndham Worldwide Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Linda Couch, Lawrence Couch, Edward Sherwood, Linda Sherwood, Pamela Van Etten, Percy Newsome, Nancy Newsome, Wayne Mauer, Gerald Van Etten and Gayle Mauer
Defendant: Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. and Wyndham Worldwide Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv02199
Filed: December 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/13/2019. (ECJ)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Martin D. Holmes to appear pro hac vice by Lawrence Couch, Linda Couch. (Brijbasi, Vijay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
February 12, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Martin D. Holmes, appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL080610.). (JP)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Corporate Parent Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.; Corporate Parent Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc... (Zacherl, Francis)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendants Wyndham Worldwide Corporation, Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., and Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/7/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint (Doc. No. 9) is extended up to and including March 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/7/2019. (ECJ)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #5 Interested persons order by Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Corporate Parent Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.; Corporate Parent Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.; Other Affiliate Iridian Asset Management, LLC for Wyndham Destinations, Inc... (Zacherl, Francis) Modified on 2/7/2019 (DMA).
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time through and including March 27, 2019 to File Response to Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Zacherl, Francis) Modified on 2/7/2019 (DMA).
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Augustine Zacherl, III on behalf of Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation (Zacherl, Francis)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court recognizes that the timeframe prescribed in Rule 4.04(b) is abbreviated and therefore waives this deadline. The parties are DIRECTED to confer regarding deadlines pertinent to a motion for class certification and advise the Court of agreeable deadlines in their case management report. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/28/2019. (MMW)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by Lawrence Couch, Linda Couch. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Lawrence Couch, Linda Couch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from Wyndham's 2014-2015 Member's Directory, #2 Exhibit Tolling Agreement, #3 Exhibit Second Tolling Agreement, #4 Exhibit Third Tolling Agreement, #5 Exhibit Fourth Tolling Agreement, #6 Exhibit Fifth Tolling Agreement, #7 Exhibit Sixth Tolling Agreement, #8 Exhibit Seventh Tolling Agreement, #9 Exhibit Eighth Tolling Agreement, #10 Exhibit Ninth Tolling Agreement, #11 Exhibit Tenth Tolling Agreement, #12 Exhibit Eleventh Tolling Agreement, #13 Exhibit Twelfth Tolling Agreement, #14 Exhibit Thirteenth Tolling Agreement, #15 Exhibit Fourteenth Tolling Agreement, #16 Exhibit Fifteenth Tolling Agreement, #17 Exhibit Sixteenth Tolling Agreement, #18 Exhibit Seventeenth Tolling Agreement, #19 Exhibit Eighteenth Tolling Agreement, #20 Exhibit Nineteenth Tolling Agreement, #21 Exhibit Twentieth Tolling Agreement, #22 Exhibit Twenty-First Tolling Agreement, #23 Exhibit Twenty-Second Tolling Agreement, #24 Exhibit Twenty-Third Tolling Agreement, #25 Exhibit Twenty-Fourth Tolling Agreement, #26 Exhibit Twenty-Fifth Tolling Agreement, #27 Exhibit Twenty-Sixth Tolling Agreement, #28 Exhibit Twenty-Seventh Tolling Agreement, #29 Exhibit Twenty-Eighth Tolling Agreement, #30 Exhibit Twenty-Ninth Tolling Agreement)(Brijbasi, Vijay)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Lawrence Couch, Linda Couch. (Brijbasi, Vijay)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lawrence Couch, Linda Couch. Related case(s): no (Brijbasi, Vijay) Modified on 1/10/2019 (DMA).
January 2, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 1/16/2019 (DMA)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing #1 the Complaint without prejudice as a shotgun pleading. On or before January 16, 2019, Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs are cautioned that failure to file an Amended Complaint within the time provided will result in the Court dismissing this case and closing the file without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/2/2019. (JRJ)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/27/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/27/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation. (DMA)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:18-cv-2199-Orl-40KRS. (NAS)
December 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wyndham Destinations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14956872) filed by Lawrence Couch, Linda Couch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from Wyndham's 2014-2015 Member's Directory, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed WWC Summons, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Destinations Summons, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed WVO Summons, #6 Proposed Summons Proposed WVR Summons)(Brijbasi, Vijay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couch et al v. Wyndham Worldwide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Destinations, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Augustine Zacherl, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Augustine Zacherl, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Augustine Zacherl, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Francis Augustine Zacherl, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Couch
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Couch
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Sherwood
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sherwood
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Van Etten
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Newsome
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Newsome
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Mauer
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Van Etten
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Mauer
Represented By: Vijay Brijbasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?