Shepherd v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Margaret Shepherd
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv02207
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Daniel C Irick
1 Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Margaret Shepherd. (Jones, Catherine)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Starks, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 2/21/2019, Plaintiff shall respond to the #14 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. No further extension should be sought absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/30/2019.(Irick, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/21/19 to File Response as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Margaret Shepherd. (Jones, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 1/30/2019 (JET).
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6-A, #8 Exhibit 6-B, #9 Exhibit 6-C, #10 Exhibit 6-D, #11 Exhibit 6-E, #12 Exhibit 7-A, #13 Exhibit 7-B, #14 Exhibit 8-A, #15 Exhibit 8-B, #16 Exhibit 8-C, #17 Exhibit 8-D, #18 Exhibit 8-E)(Broderick, Patrick) Modified on 1/22/2019 (JET).
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Starks, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Starks, Michael) Modified on 1/7/2019 (JET).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 1/18/2019, Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/4/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Agreed Motion to Strike Jury Trial Demand in Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/4/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Margaret Shepherd. Related case(s): Yes (Jones, Catherine)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Margaret Shepherd identifying Other Affiliate Federal National Mortgage Association, Other Affiliate U.S. Bank, National Association, Other Affiliate Robertson, Anschutz & Schneid, P.L., Other Affiliate Brock & Scott, PLLC, Other Affiliate Greenberg Traurig, P.A., Other Affiliate Catherine Jones, Other Affiliate LegalNinja, LLC, Other Affiliate Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Other Affiliate Jeffrey Shepherd for Margaret Shepherd.. (Jones, Catherine)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand in Amended Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Starks, Michael) Modified on 1/4/2019 (JET). Jury Demand STRICKEN per Order #10.
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/28/2018. (DJD) ctp (DJD).
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/11/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2018. (DJD) ctp
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance as Co-Counsel by Patrick G. Broderick on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Broderick, Patrick) Modified on 12/31/2018 (JET).
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:18-cv-2207-Orl-41DCI. (SJB)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/18/19, to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Starks, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2018 (JET).
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Court, case number 05-2018-CA-038178 filed in State Court on 07/22/2018. Filing fee $400, receipt number 113A-14960216 filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B: Complaint, Amended Complaint and exhibits, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Starks, Michael) Modified on 12/27/2018 (JET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Shepherd
Represented By: Catherine Jean Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Starks
Represented By: Patrick G. Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?