Jeannis v. Bayerische Mortoren Werke AG et al

Plaintiff: Andy Jeannis
Defendant: Bayerische Mortoren Werke AG and BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv02216
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Anne C Conway
1 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases #4 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by BMW of North America, LLC. Related case(s): no (Rudock, Robert) Modified on 1/14/2019 (RMF).
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by BMW of North America, LLC. (Rudock, Robert)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andy Jeannis. Related case(s): yes (Gillen, Patrick)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Andy Jeannis. (Gillen, Patrick)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by BMW of North America, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Other Documents)(Rudock, Robert)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 BMW NA's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by BMW of North America, LLC.(Rudock, Robert)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2599, In re: Takata Airbag Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 1/2/2019, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal and State Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RMF)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/11/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/28/2018. (RMF)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:18-cv-2216-Orl-22KRS. (SJB)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by BMW of North America, LLC. (Rudock, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Orange County, FL, case number 2018-CA-011649-O filed in State Court on 10/25/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14962552 filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT)(Rudock, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeannis v. Bayerische Mortoren Werke AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Jeannis
Represented By: Patrick Alexander Gillen
Represented By: C. Richard Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Mortoren Werke AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Robert John Rudock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?