Professional, Inc. v. Kemper Independent Insurance Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Professional, Inc. and Professional, Inc. doing business as Professionals Auto Body
Defendant: Kemper Independent Insurance Company and TVM Building Products, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv06024
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Entry of Judgment by Kemper Independent Insurance Company. (Kavouras, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/16/2020. (LAM)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum In Support by Kemper Independent Insurance Company. (Kavouras, Daniel)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER after consideration of the Joint Stipulation and Report dated July 10, 2020 (Doc. 348 in 6:14-md-2557-Orl-31EJK). Defendants shall file responsive pleadings or motions by August 7, 2020. Discovery is STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/14/2020. (LAM)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the stay is hereby LIFTED. The parties shall confer and advise the Court by July 10, 2020, how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/24/2020. (LAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 Member Cases Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (MAA)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g) (327) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (325) Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Debra H. Miller terminated in case 6:14-md-6008; 6:14-md-6011; 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (317) Motion to Appear Telephonically in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. It is Liaison Counsel's responsibility to arrange for and coordinate the conference call with District Judge Presnell's Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/3/2019. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas)
June 21, 2018 Case Stayed. (BIA)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 motion to stay. Any and all deadlines and proceedings in this action, including any and all pleadings and motions, are STAYED pending disposition of the several cases presently on appeal before the Eleventh Circuit in 6:17-md-2557. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/21/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) Modified on 6/21/2018 to reflect order is an endorsed order (LAM).
March 7, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to stay by Kemper Independent Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Kavouras, Daniel)
February 2, 2018 Filing 13 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 6:14-md-2557 Receipt of original record from the Western District of Pennsylvania, case number: 3:17-cv-176. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:18-cv-6024-Orl-31TBS. (MAA) Modified on 2/2/2018 (MAA).
February 2, 2018 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00176. File received electronically
January 31, 2018 Filing 11 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Middle District of Florida. (jjg) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 10 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 8 ERROR: DOCUMENT FILED IN WRONG CASE; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by TVM BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Lewis, Jordan) Modified on 11/7/2017. (cel) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. It is further Ordered that any and all deadlines and proceedings in this Action are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this Action will be transferred and consolidated with the Auto Body Shop MDL. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/31/2017. (dlg) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Stay filed by KEMPER INDEPENDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Consolidated Actions) (Goodman, Eric) Modified on 10/31/2017. (cel) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer Decision by JPML by KEMPER INDEPENDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goodman, Eric) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Huff, II on behalf of PROFESSIONAL, INC.. (Huff, James) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 3 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by KEMPER INDEPENDENT INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due from KEMPER INDEPENDENT INSURANCE COMPANY on 11/6/2017. (Goodman, Eric) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 2 EXHIBIT in Support of #1 Notice of Removal by KEMPER INDEPENDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (cel) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Blair County, case number 2017GN2477 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4480420), filed by KEMPER INDEPENDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) [Transferred from pawd on 2/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Professional, Inc. v. Kemper Independent Insurance Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Independent Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Eric R. Goodman
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVM Building Products, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Jordan M. Lewis
Represented By: Jordan Montgomery Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Huff, II
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional, Inc. doing business as Professionals Auto Body
Represented By: James R. Huff, II
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?