Roor International BV et al v. Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc. , et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Askander Mirza, Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc. d/b/a Speedy Mart & Deli and Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00039
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 2/26/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Askander Mirza. (Sasson, Jamie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-39-ORL-37-LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (EJS)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc. (LMM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 1/16/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/23/19. (MT)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/8/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/8/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Askander Mirza, Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc..(LMM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:19-cv-39-Orl-37KRS. (SJB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14988826) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc. , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Askander Mirza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc. d/b/a Speedy Mart & Deli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Shore Food Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?