Roor International BV et al v. Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC and Elghali Elakram
Case Number: 6:2019cv00126
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for trial by jury by Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC, Elghali Elakram. (Minerley, Kenneth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC, Elghali Elakram identifying Corporate Parent Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC for Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC, Elghali Elakram.. (Minerley, Kenneth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC, Elghali Elakram.(Minerley, Kenneth)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC. (SPM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Elghali Elakram. (SPM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (SPM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/5/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/22/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/5/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 1/22/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-126-Orl-41DCI. (SJB)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15035385) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beach Valley Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Represented By: Ashley Darnelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elghali Elakram
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Represented By: Ashley Darnelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?