United States of America et al v. B3 Enterprises LLC et al

Plaintiff: EJS Contracting, Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: B3 Enterprises LLC and Aegis Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00142
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSFER to Jacksonville Division and assigned case number 3:19-cv-288-J-32MCR (SPM)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to transfer case. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Jacksonville Division and close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/11/2019. (DJD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION to transfer venue by EJS Contracting, Inc. (Birr, James) Modified on 3/7/2019 (SPM).
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Aegis Security Insurance Company, B3 Enterprises LLC , COUNTERCLAIM against EJS Contracting, Inc. by B3 Enterprises LLC (Jonczak, Heather) Modified on 3/7/2019 (SPM).
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Aegis Security Insurance Company, B3 Enterprises LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aegis Security, Inc., Corporate Parent K2 Insurance Services, LLC for Aegis Security Insurance Company, B3 Enterprises LLC.. (Jonczak, Heather)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-142-ORL-41-LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (EJS)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (Doc. No. 1) is extended up to and including March 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/21/2019. (ECJ)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to March 7, 2019, to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aegis Security Insurance Company, B3 Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jonczak, Heather) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 2/21/2019 (SPM).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant by 3/6/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/20/2019. (DJD) ctp
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Jonczak on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Company, B3 Enterprises LLC (Jonczak, Heather)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on Jan. 31, 2019 by EJS Contracting, Inc. as to B3 Enterprises LLC. (Birr, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on Jan. 29, 2019 by EJS Contracting, Inc. as to Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Birr, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by EJS Contracting, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EJS CONTRACTING, INC. for EJS Contracting, Inc... (Birr, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company, B3 Enterprises LLC. (JET)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/6/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 1/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:19-cv-142-Orl-41KRS. (SJB)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to B3 Enterprise LLC by EJS Contracting, Inc. (Birr, James) Modified on 1/23/2019 (JET).
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company by EJS Contracting, Inc. (Birr, James) Modified on 1/23/2019 (JET).
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet re #1 Complaint by EJS Contracting, Inc. (Birr, James) Modified on 1/23/2019 (JET).
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B3 Enterprises LLC, and Aegis Security Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113A-15042838) filed by EJS Contracting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Birr, James) Modified on 1/23/2019 (JET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. B3 Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B3 Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Heather Marie Jonczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Marie Jonczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EJS Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: James O. Birr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?