TGA 3851 Grandpine Way LLC v. Perry

Plaintiff: TGA 3851 Grandpine Way LLC
Defendant: Annette Perry
Case Number: 6:2019cv00153
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Annette Perry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/25/2019. (JET)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to remand to State Court by TGA 3851 Grandpine Way LLC. (McCabe, William)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by TGA 3851 Grandpine Way LLC. (McCabe, William)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related case re #3 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TGA 3851 Grandpine Way LLC. Related cases: No. (Unilateral Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge attached.) (McCabe, William) Modified on 2/12/2019 (JET).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/1/2019. (DJD) ctp
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/15/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 2/1/2019. (DJD) ctp
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Annette Perry. (JET) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Seminole County, case number 2018-CC-4419-21-S, filed in State Court on 12/28/18, filed by Annette Perry. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT with exhibits, #2 State Court Other Document, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TGA 3851 Grandpine Way LLC v. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TGA 3851 Grandpine Way LLC
Represented By: William J. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?