Roor International BV et al v. Cocoa Smoke Shop, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Cigarette Depot, Inc., Eduardo Ortega, Cocoa Smoke Shop, LLC and Josh Gimelstein
Case Number: 6:2019cv00170
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 3/9/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Eduardo Ortega. (Sasson, Jamie)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Cocoa Smoke Shop, LLC, Josh Gimelstein. (BIA)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cocoa Smoke Shop, LLC, Josh Gimelstein filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Summons Cocoa Smoke Shop, #7 Proposed Summons Josh Gimelstein)(Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 3/13/2019 (BIA).
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/21/19. (ESG)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/29/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/29/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Eduardo Ortega. (BIA)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Cigarette Depot, Inc. (BIA)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-170-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15057271) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Cocoa Smoke Shop, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigarette Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cocoa Smoke Shop, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Gimelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?