Henry et al v. Orlando Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Clark and Denita Henry
Defendant: M.D. Kelvin Wilson, M.D. Perry Dhaliwal, University of Florida Board of Trustees, Orlando Health, Inc., Kevin S. Wilson and Perry Dhaliwal
Case Number: 6:2019cv00239
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to remove Defendant Kevin S. Wilson from the case and amend the case style accordingly. Denying as moot #7 motion to dismiss; Granting in part #22 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, Case Number 2018-CA-010363-O. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/11/2019. (DJD)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for Darryn Silverstein to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing by 3/25/19. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/11/2019. (DJD) ctp
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jerome Clark, Denita Henry (Bush, Kenneth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 , #9 , #12 , MOTIONS to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, and MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Jerome Clark, Denita Henry. (Bush, Kenneth) Modified on 3/5/2019 (JET).
February 26, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #7 , #9 , and #12 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (JET)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a response to the pending motions to dismiss on or before March 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/26/2019. (HMK)
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to through March 4, 2019 to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss, #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #12 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Bush, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 2/26/2019 (DMA).
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Bush on behalf of Jerome Clark, Denita Henry (Bush, Kenneth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Orlando Health, Inc.. (Stephens, Meredith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Orlando Health, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Stephens, Meredith) Modified on 2/25/2019 (JET).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/22/2019. (HMK)
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by University of Florida Board of Trustees. Related case(s): yes (Pierce, Francis)
February 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by University of Florida Board of Trustees. (Pierce, Francis)
February 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order by University of Florida Board of Trustees, Kevin S. Wilson, and Perry Dhaliwal. (Pierce, Francis) Modified on 2/19/2019 (JET).
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by University of Florida Board of Trustees. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT)(Pierce, Francis)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Margaret Stephens and Jennings L. Hurt III, on behalf of Orlando Health, Inc. (Stephens, Meredith) Modified on 2/13/2019 (JET).
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Orlando Health, Inc..(Stephens, Meredith)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Perry Dhaliwal. (Pierce, Francis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Kevin S. Wilson. (Pierce, Francis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and for substitution of the United States of America as a party defendant by Kevin S. Wilson. (Pierce, Francis) Modified on 2/12/2019 (JET).
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Darryn Silverstein of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (JET)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to extend time to serve complaint by Denita Henry and Jerome Clark (included re #1 Notice of Removal). (Pierce, Francis) Modified on 2/8/2019 (JET). ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/15/19.
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/21/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 2/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-239-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2018CA010363 filed in State Court on 9/20/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15101589 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry et al v. Orlando Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Kelvin Wilson
Represented By: Francis Edmund Pierce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Perry Dhaliwal
Represented By: Francis Edmund Pierce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Florida Board of Trustees
Represented By: Francis Edmund Pierce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Health, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith Margaret Stephens
Represented By: Jennings L. Hurt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin S. Wilson
Represented By: Francis Edmund Pierce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Dhaliwal
Represented By: Francis Edmund Pierce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Clark
Represented By: Darryn Silverstein
Represented By: Kenneth J Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denita Henry
Represented By: Darryn Silverstein
Represented By: Kenneth J Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?