Roor International BV et al v. Tobacco District, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Tobacco District, Inc., Dani S Hatoum and Dani S. Hatoum
Case Number: 6:2019cv00242
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to show cause filed by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/11/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/11/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Dani S. Hatoum. (BIA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Tobacco District, Inc. (BIA)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-242-Orl-31GJK. (SJB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15103099) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Tobacco District, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco District, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dani S Hatoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dani S. Hatoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?