Lachaud v. Florida Department of Transportation

Plaintiff: JEAN LACHAUD
Defendant: Florida Department of Transportation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00264
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Paul G Byron
1 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hall, Anthony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Florida Department of Transportation.(Blystone, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or by March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/13/2019. (SCM)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Florida Department of Transportation. (Blystone, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Florida Department of Transportation. Related case(s): yes (Blystone, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Florida Department of Transportation. (Blystone, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard V. Blystone on behalf of Florida Department of Transportation (Blystone, Richard)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Jean Lachaud. (Hall, Anthony)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jean Lachaud. Related case(s): no (Hall, Anthony)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/11/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/11/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Florida Department of Transportation. (RDO)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-264-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Department of Transportation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15112005) filed by JEAN LACHAUD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hall, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lachaud v. Florida Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN LACHAUD
Represented By: Anthony J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Transportation
Represented By: Richard V. Blystone
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?