Irizarry et al v. Orlando Utilities Commission et al

Plaintiff: Joann Nixon, Valerie Williams, Michelle Irizarry, Brandon Litt, Joanne Nixon and Joann Robinson
Defendant: Orlando Utilities Commission, Avalon Park Group Management Inc., U.S. Home Corporation, Lennar Corporation, Beat Kahli, Lennar Homes, LLC, Boral Resources, LLC, Avalon Park Group Management, Inc. and Preferred Materials, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00268
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 48 SUMMONS issued as to Boral Resources, LLC, Lennar Homes, LLC, Preferred Materials, Inc. (BIA)
April 3, 2019 Filing 47 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Michelle Irizarry, Brandon Litt, Joanne Nixon, Joann Robinson, Valerie Williams. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 3, 2019 Filing 46 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Michelle Irizarry, Brandon Litt, Joanne Nixon, Joann Robinson, Valerie Williams. (Leopold, Theodore)
April 3, 2019 Filing 45 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Michelle Irizarry, Brandon Litt, Joanne Nixon, Joann Robinson, Valerie Williams. (Leopold, Theodore)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying as moot #38 Dispositive Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #40 Dispositive Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/28/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
March 27, 2019 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Diana) Modified on 3/28/2019 (BIA).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney Dara Lynn Lindquist terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/20/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
March 19, 2019 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Dara L. Lindquist to withdraw as attorney by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Lindquist, Dara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
March 18, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Avalon Park Group Management, Inc., Beat Kahli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeMeo, Ralph)
March 17, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Orlando Utilities Commission.(Weinstein, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gerber, Daniel)
March 11, 2019 Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Weinstein, David)
March 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael B. Brightman, appearing on behalf of Michelle Irizarry, Joanne Nixon, Valerie Williams (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL081162.) Related document: #35 Second Amended MOTION for Michael Brightman to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/7/2019. (KWH)
March 5, 2019 Filing 35 Second Amended MOTION for Michael Brightman to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Special Attorney Admission Certification)(Leopold, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 3/6/2019 (BIA).
March 4, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Daniel Wilson, appearing on behalf of Michelle Irizarry, Joanne Nixon, Valerie Williams (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL-80998.) Related document: #22 Amended MOTION for Daniel Wilson to appear pro hac vice. (BIA)
March 4, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stephen Morrissey, appearing on behalf of Michelle Irizarry, Joanne Nixon, Valerie Williams (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL080997.) Related document: #19 Amended MOTION for Stephen E. Morrissey to appear pro hac vice. (JP) Modified on 3/4/2019 (BIA).
March 4, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Vineet Bhatia, appearing on behalf of Michelle Irizarry, Joanne Nixon, Valerie Williams (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL080996.) Related document: #20 Amended MOTION for Vineet Bhatia to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/1/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave of Court for Lauren D. Brooks to Appear Telephonically by Avalon Park Group Management, Inc., Beat Kahli. (DeMeo, Ralph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 3/4/2019 (BIA).
February 27, 2019 Filing 32 Remark: Docs. #24 , #27 , #28 , and #31 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/27/19. (ESG)
February 26, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Michelle Irizarry, Joanne Nixon, Valerie Williams. (Martin, Diana)
February 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re: #9 Related Case Order and Track 2 Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Avalon Park Group Management, Inc., Beat Kahli. Related case(s): Yes (DeMeo, Ralph)
February 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michelle Irizarry, Joanne Nixon, Valerie Williams. Related case(s): No (Martin, Diana) Modified on 2/27/2019 (BIA).
February 26, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Avalon Park Group Management, Inc., Beat Kahli identifying Corporate Parent Avalon Park Group Management, Inc. for Avalon Park Group Management, Inc., Beat Kahli.. (DeMeo, Ralph)
February 26, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Tiblier, Christian)
February 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Tiblier, Christian)
February 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Orlando Utilities Commission. Related case(s): no (Weinstein, David) Modified on 2/27/2019 (BIA).
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Orlando Utilities Commission identifying Corporate Parent Orlando Utilities Commission for Orlando Utilities Commission.. (Weinstein, David)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #20 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #21 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #22 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/26/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Daniel Wilson to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Leopold, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 26, 2019 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Michael Brightman to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Leopold, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 Amended MOTION for Vineet Bhatia to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Leopold, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for Stephen Morrissey to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Leopold, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 motion for Kent Mayo, Megan J. Berge and Sterling A. Marchand to appear pro hac vice for Defendant OUC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/22/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Kent Mayo, Megan Berge and Sterling Marchand to appear pro hac vice by Orlando Utilities Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mayo Special Admission Attorney Certification, #2 Exhibit Berge Special Admission Attorney Certification, #3 Exhibit Marchand Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Mitchell, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/20/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (filed as Notice to Remove Counsel Within Same Firm) by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation (Lindquist, Dara) Modified on 2/20/2019 (BIA).
February 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kent Mayo, appearing on behalf of Orlando Utilities Commission (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL080684.). (JP)
February 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Megan H. Berge, appearing on behalf of Orlando Utilities Commission (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL080684.). (JP)
February 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Sterling A. Marchand, appearing on behalf of Orlando Utilities Commission (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL080684.). (JP)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to extend to March 4, 2019 the deadline for the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/15/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to extend Case Management Conference Deadline by Orlando Utilities Commission. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 2/15/2019 (BIA).
February 13, 2019 Set deadlines: Answer due by 3/17/2019. (BIA)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. All Defendants have until March 17, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/13/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Orlando Utilities Commission. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/12/2019. (CTP)(JLC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/12/2019. (CTP)(JLC)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #4 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #5 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #6 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/11/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel David A. Theriaque and S. Brent Spain of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk) (copies mailed). (BIA)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-268-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Vineet Bhatia to appear pro hac vice filed by All Plaintiffs in Orange County Circuit Court on 01/15/2019. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Daniel Wilson to appear pro hac vice filed by All Plaintiffs in Orange County Circuit Court on 01/15/2019. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Stephen E. Morrissey to appear pro hac vice filed by All Plaintiffs in Orange County Circuit Court on 01/15/2019. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Michael B. Brightman to appear pro hac vice filed by All Plaintiffs in Orange County Circuit Court on 01/15/2019. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, case number 2018-CA-13758-O filed in State Court on December 20, 2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15113186 filed by Orlando Utilities Commission. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT State Complaint, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Pending Motions, #4 State Court Pending Motions, #5 State Court Pending Motions, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court Other Documents, #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet State Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheer)(Weinstein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irizarry et al v. Orlando Utilities Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Utilities Commission
Represented By: David Barnett Weinstein
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Hopper
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Kent A. Mayo
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Represented By: Richard E. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Park Group Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Home Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Dara Lynn Lindquist
Represented By: Suzanne Barto Hill
Represented By: Christian H Tiblier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Dara Lynn Lindquist
Represented By: Suzanne Barto Hill
Represented By: Christian H Tiblier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beat Kahli
Represented By: Lauren DeWeil Brooks
Represented By: Ralph A. DeMeo
Represented By: Steven Brent Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boral Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Park Group Management, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren DeWeil Brooks
Represented By: Ralph A. DeMeo
Represented By: Steven Brent Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Materials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Williams
Represented By: Stephen E. Morrissey
Represented By: Daniel Wilson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Michael B. Brightman
Represented By: Diana L. Martin
Represented By: Vineet Bhatia
Represented By: Leslie M. Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Irizarry
Represented By: Stephen E. Morrissey
Represented By: Daniel Wilson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Michael B. Brightman
Represented By: Diana L. Martin
Represented By: Vineet Bhatia
Represented By: Leslie M. Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Litt
Represented By: Stephen E. Morrissey
Represented By: Daniel Wilson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Michael B. Brightman
Represented By: Vineet Bhatia
Represented By: Diana L. Martin
Represented By: Leslie M. Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Nixon
Represented By: Stephen E. Morrissey
Represented By: Daniel Wilson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Michael B. Brightman
Represented By: Diana L. Martin
Represented By: Vineet Bhatia
Represented By: Leslie M. Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Robinson
Represented By: Stephen E. Morrissey
Represented By: Daniel Wilson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Michael B. Brightman
Represented By: Vineet Bhatia
Represented By: Diana L. Martin
Represented By: Leslie M. Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?