Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL v Chenega Infinity, LLC
Plaintiff: Transport Workers Union of America, AFL/CIO Local 525 and Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Chenega Infinity, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00285
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for summary judgment by Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Kevin Smith - Declaration, #2 Albert Derr - Declatation, #3 Richard Thomas - Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)(Lev, Tobe)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris on behalf of Chenega Infinity, LLC (Adler-Paindiris, Stephanie)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Chenega Infinity, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Chenega Corporation for Chenega Infinity, LLC.. (Simpson, Amanda)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint to Compel Arbitration by Chenega Infinity, LLC.(Simpson, Amanda)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:19-cv-285-Orl-40TBS. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this case is transferred to the Honorable Paul G. Byron, with his permission, for consideration with 6:18-cv-978. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2019. (TKW)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO. Related case(s): yes (Lev, Tobe) Modified on 2/27/2019 (LMM).
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO. (Lev, Tobe)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on February 15, 2019 by Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO as to Chenega Infinity, LLC. (Lev, Tobe)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Chenega Infinity, LLC. (LMM)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/27/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/13/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/27/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/13/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-285-Orl-31TBS. (SJB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO. (Lev, Tobe) Modified on 2/13/2019 (LMM).
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO. (Lev, Tobe) Modified on 2/13/2019 (LMM).
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Arbitration against Chenega Infinity, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15122044) filed by Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lev, Tobe) Modified on 2/13/2019 (LMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL v Chenega Infinity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transport Workers Union of America, AFL/CIO Local 525
Represented By: Tobe Lev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transport Workers Union of America Local 525, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Tobe Lev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chenega Infinity, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Leigh Adler-Paindiris
Represented By: Amanda A. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?