Princeton Oaks Industrial Investors, LLC v. Stanley Stephens Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Princeton Oaks Industrial Investors, LLC
Defendant: Stanley Stephens Co., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00297
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal . This action is REMANDED to the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/22/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal by Stanley Stephens Co., Inc.. (Shane, Richard)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to show cause why why its claim for jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a) should not be dismissed or disregarded due to deficient citizenship allegations as to Stanley Stephens Co., Inc. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-297-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CIRCUIT COURT OF THE NINTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA, IN AND FOR ORANGE COUNTY, case number 2019-CA-001387-O filed in State Court on 2/1/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15129497 filed by Stanley Stephens Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shane, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton Oaks Industrial Investors, LLC v. Stanley Stephens Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Stephens Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard David Shane
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Oaks Industrial Investors, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Kay Vander Velde
Represented By: Natalie P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?