Tamayo Vega v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rubier Tamayo Vega
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00491
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 (re: VANESSA ELIZABETH DIAZ and CRAIG DOWNS) & Local Rule 2.02 (CATHERINE PYUNE McELDOWNEY, DON KELLER, HAYCRAFT and KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES). (signed by deputy clerk). (MAA)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-10289. File received electronically
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from laed on 3/14/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 3/14/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 3/14/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from laed on 3/14/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 3/14/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7207092) filed by Rubier Tamayo Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not To Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Rubier Tamayo Vega(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from laed on 3/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamayo Vega v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubier Tamayo Vega
Represented By: Craig Downs
Represented By: Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?