Guzman Lopez et al v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc.

Plaintiff: Mary Ramirez and Jose Guzman Lopez
Defendant: Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00542
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (BIA)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2019, Discovery due by 4/6/2020, Dispositive motions due by 5/4/2020, Pretrial statement due by 8/20/2020, All other motions due by 8/27/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/6/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/20/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC) Modified on 6/26/2019 (JLC).
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/31/19. (ESG)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc. (Diederich, Andrea) Modified on 5/31/2019 (BIA).
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc.. Related case(s): No (Diederich, Andrea)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Amended CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Diederich, Andrea) Modified on 5/28/2019 (BIA).
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Diederich, Andrea)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #6 Amended Complaint by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc..(Diederich, Andrea)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jose Guzman Lopez. Related case(s): no (Lawrence, Chadwick) Modified on 4/17/2019 (LMM).
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lawrence, Chadwick)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/25/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc. (AC)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc. with Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ORL081411 filed by Jose Guzman Lopez and Mary Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman Lopez et al v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ramirez
Represented By: Chadwick Joseph Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Guzman Lopez
Represented By: Chadwick Joseph Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Lozano Diederich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?