JCS Industries LLC v. DesignStein LLC et al
Plaintiff: JCS Industries LLC
Defendant: DesignStein LLC and Bryan Knowlton
Case Number: 6:2019cv00544
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 Remark: Doc. #23 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/15/19. (MT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Boomershine, Stephanie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by DesignStein LLC, Bryan Knowlton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Defendants)(Conlin, Cynthia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by DesignStein LLC, Bryan Knowlton. (Conlin, Cynthia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #21 Order directing compliance, #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by DesignStein LLC, Bryan Knowlton. Related case(s): no (Conlin, Cynthia)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order #7 and Interested Persons Order #8. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 8, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (BIA)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion for Leave to File. On or before Friday, July 12, 2019, Defendants may file a three-page reply. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (MT)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file reply to re #17 Response in Opposition re #14 Motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by DesignStein LLC, Bryan Knowlton. (Conlin, Cynthia) Modified on 7/9/2019 (BIA).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order #7. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by JCS Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boomershine, Stephanie)
June 11, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (BIA)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's response due by June 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/11/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by JCS Industries LLC. (Boomershine, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by DesignStein LLC, Bryan Knowlton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Defendants)(Conlin, Cynthia) Modified on 5/29/2019 (BIA).
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/09/2019 by JCS Industries LLC as to All Defendants. (Boomershine, Stephanie)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 Remark: Doc. #11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/9/19. (PKK)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by JCS Industries LLC. (Boomershine, Stephanie)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JCS Industries LLC. Related case(s): no (Boomershine, Stephanie)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Boomershine, Stephanie)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/25/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
March 21, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/28/2019 (BIA)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Bryan Knowlton. (MAA)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/21/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to DesignStein LLC. (AC) Modified on 3/21/2019 (MAA).
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (AC)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-544-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-15261331) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Boomershine, Stephanie) Modified on 3/20/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JCS Industries LLC v. DesignStein LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DesignStein LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Dawn Reed
Represented By: Cynthia Ariel Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Knowlton
Represented By: Jennifer Dawn Reed
Represented By: Cynthia Ariel Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JCS Industries LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Marie Boomershine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?