Progressive Select Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation v. Rafferty et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Defendant: Patrick Jay Rafferty and Stephanie Alexandra Simich
Case Number: 6:2019cv00566
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Freeman, Stuart)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Stephanie Alexandra Simich. (Swartwood, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stephanie Alexandra Simich. Related case(s): no (Swartwood, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/10/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Meeting by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Freeman, Stuart) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Stephanie Alexandra Simich.(Swartwood, Gregory)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/3/19 by Progressive Select Insurance Company as to Stephanie Alexandra Simich. (Freeman, Stuart)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Patrick Jay Rafferty. (BIA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Patrick Jay Rafferty by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A Motion Entry Default)(Freeman, Stuart) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 5/7/19 by Progressive Select Insurance Company as to Patrick Jay Rafferty. (Freeman, Stuart)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Remark: Doc. #5 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/10/19. (PKK)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Freeman, Stuart)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Freeman, Stuart)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/28/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/28/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Patrick Jay Rafferty, Stephanie Alexandra Simich. (AC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Jay Rafferty, Stephanie Alexandra Simich, Filing fee $400.00, receipt number ORL081427, filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Select Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation v. Rafferty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Jay Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Alexandra Simich
Represented By: Gregory D. Swartwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart J. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?