Naked Whey, Inc. v. McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Naked Whey, Inc.
Defendant: McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC, Jeffrey A, McCarrell, DOES 1-25, Inclusive, Does 1-25 and Jeffrey A. McCarrell
Case Number: 6:2019cv00587
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:0044
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 36 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Brian R. Gilchrist appointed as Mediator. (LMM)
June 5, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2019, Discovery due by 8/31/2020, Dispositive motions due by 9/15/2020, Joint Pretrial statement due by 12/18/2020, All other motions due by 12/31/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Trial term begins 2/1/2021 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 11/2/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/17/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/17/2020 (LMM)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/4/2019. (TKW)
June 3, 2019 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Antoine, Heather)
May 31, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to #29 Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Naked Whey, Inc..(Antoine, Heather)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/23/2019. (MKH)
May 22, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
May 10, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #27 Interested persons order by Jeffrey A. McCarrell, McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC. (Garcia, Susana)
May 10, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Naked Whey, Inc. by Jeffrey A. McCarrell, McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC.(Garcia, Susana)
May 1, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Sharon Urias, appearing on behalf of Jeffrey A. McCarrell, McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL082345.) Related document: #25 MOTION for Sharon Urias to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
April 29, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Answer due by 5/10/2019. (LMM)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file their answer or otherwise responded to Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. No. 1) on or before May 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/26/2019. (MKH)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to DEFENDANTS MCCARRELL FITNESSCOMPANIES, LLC and JEFFREY A. MCCARRELL. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/26/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/26/2019. (MKH)
April 25, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Sharon Urias to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey A. McCarrell, McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC. (Garcia, Susana) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
April 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Jeffrey A. McCarrell, McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC. (Garcia, Susana)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #22 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/16/2019. (MKH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Jeffrey F. Gersh to appear pro hac vice by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Heather Ann Antoine to appear pro hac vice by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
April 16, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 04/11/2019 by Naked Whey, Inc. as to Jeffrey A. McCarrell. (Wasylik, Dineen)
April 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Heather A. Antoine, appearing on behalf of Naked Whey, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number Orl081997.). (RCN)
April 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jeffrey F. Gersh, appearing on behalf of Naked Whey, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL081997.). (RCN)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE to counsel, Heather A. Antoine and Jeffrey F. Gersh, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LMM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Naked Whey, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Wasylik, Dineen) Modified on 4/12/2019 (LMM).
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen) Modified on 4/12/2019 (LMM).
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 04/05/2019 by Naked Whey, Inc. as to McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC. (Wasylik, Dineen)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 Alias SUMMONS issued as to Jeffrey A. McCarrell, McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC. (LMM)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Naked Whey, Inc. as to Jeffrey A. McCarrell. (Wasylik, Dineen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Naked Whey, Inc. as to McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC. (Wasylik, Dineen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (LMM)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Jeffrey A. McCarrell, McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC. (LMM)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/28/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/28/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-587-Orl-31LRH. (SJB)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen) Modified on 3/28/2019 (LMM).
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Naked Whey, Inc.. (Wasylik, Dineen)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15283935) filed by Naked Whey, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC, #8 Proposed Summons Jeffrey A. McCarrell)(Wasylik, Dineen) Modified on 3/28/2019 (LMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naked Whey, Inc. v. McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naked Whey, Inc.
Represented By: Dineen Pashoukos Wasylik
Represented By: Heather A. Antoine
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Gersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarrell Fitness Companies, LLC
Represented By: Sharon Urias
Represented By: Susana Cristina Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A, McCarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. McCarrell
Represented By: Sharon Urias
Represented By: Susana Cristina Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?