Ondo v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Ondo
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC and Charter Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00588
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Peter J. Grilli appointed as Mediator. (BIA)
July 1, 2019 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 8/14/2019, Discovery due by 2/3/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/2/2020, Pretrial statement due by 6/12/2020, All other motions due by 6/26/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 5/4/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/3/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/3/2019 (BIA)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/1/2019. (TKW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wilson, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for leave to conduct Rule 26(f) conference by telephone. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/17/2019. (ED)
June 15, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Conduct the Rule 26(f) Conference via Telephone by Christopher Ondo. (Marco, David)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER that upon consideration of the #21 Response to #19 Order to show cause filed by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC, that the Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/30/2019. (TKW)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #19 Order to show cause filed by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trellis Company, Other Affiliate David C. Borucke, Other Affiliate Charter Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Other Affiliate Christopher Ondo, Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate David M Marco, Other Affiliate SmithMarco, P.C for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.. (Borucke, David)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Defendant Waypoint Resource Group, LLC to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to respond to the Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/29/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Borucke, David)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 DEFENDANT WAYPOINT AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC's answer or response due 5/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/21/2019. (MB)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 Second Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/21/2019 (BIA).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Defendant Waypoint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC's answer or response due 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/30/2019. (MB)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to DEFENDANT WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/14/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/30/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Borucke on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC (Borucke, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Charter Communications, Inc. Related case(s): no (Spengler, Sangeeta) Modified on 4/29/2019 (BIA).
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Spengler, Sangeeta)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Charter Communications, Inc.(Spengler, Sangeeta) Modified on 4/29/2019 (BIA).
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Christopher Ondo. (Marco, David)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christopher Ondo. Related case(s): no (Marco, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Charter Communications, Inc., Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (BIA)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/28/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/28/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-588-Orl-31GJK. (SJB)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Charles Wilson on behalf of Christopher Ondo (Wilson, Andrew)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15286397) filed by Christopher Ondo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Charter Communications, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Waypoint Resource Group, LLC)(Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ondo v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: David C. Borucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Sangeeta Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ondo
Represented By: Andrew Charles Wilson
Represented By: David M. Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?