Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 99.101.168.108

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.101.168.108
Case Number: 6:2019cv00609
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
2 Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Order) (LMM)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #11 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/28/2019. (TKW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice of John Doe by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel) Modified on 6/28/2019 (LMM).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f)Conference. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/6/2019. (RN)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave for Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory A. Presnell. New case number: 6:19-cv-609-Orl-31DCI. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Gregory A. Presnell, with his consent, for consideration with related cases. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/2/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/2/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (DMA) (copies mailed)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-609-Orl-40DCI. (NAS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): no (Walker, Rachel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Walker, Rachel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - INJUNCTIVE RELIEF SOUGHT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.101.168.108 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15296920) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 99.101.168.108
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.101.168.108
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?