Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 97.101.173.205 and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2019cv00631
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #19 Order to show cause filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Emilie Kennedy in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause)(Walker, Rachel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to extend time to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to show cause. Ruling on the Defendant's Motion to Quash (Doc. 12) is DEFERRED. On or before July 12, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this Court may reasonably rely upon the Plaintiff's usage of geolocation or other technologies to establish the identity of the Defendant and that the Defendant may be found within this District. Mere speculation and conjecture will not suffice. Additionally, within the allotted time, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed sua sponte for improper venue. On or before July 12, 2019, Plaintiff shall describe in detail the investigation it intends to undertake using the information it seeks to have the subpoena recipient produce that will properly allow it to name a specific individual as the alleged infringer of its copyright. On or before July 26, 2019, Defendant may file a reply to Plaintiff's response to this Order. Plaintiff's failure to file a response in compliance with this Order within the allotted time may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/26/2019. (DMA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Objection and Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #16 Limited Motion to Stay. Also, any further fillings that fail to comply with Local Rule 1.05 will be stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/13/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 Limited MOTION to stay June 17, 2019 deadline pending Motion to Quash by John Doe. (Ghaeenzadeh, Amir) Modified on 6/12/2019 (LMM).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/3/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Amir Ghaeenzadeh re #13 Notice of Objection and Motion to Quash Subpoena, #12 Objection and Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena by John Doe. (Ghaeenzadeh, Amir) Modified on 5/31/2019 (BIA).
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Objection and Motion to Quash Subpoena re #13 Objection and Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena by John Doe (Ghaeenzadeh, Amir) Modified on 5/31/2019 (BIA).
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Objection and Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena by John Doe. (Ghaeenzadeh, Amir) Modified on 5/31/2019 (BIA).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/6/2019. (RN)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave for Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-631-Orl-31DCI. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER In the interests of justice, the undersigned transfers this case to United States Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick, with his permission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/3/2019. (MB)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/3/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/3/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LMM)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-631-Orl-31GJK. (SJB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement - Injunctive Relief Sought against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15304054) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel) Modified on 4/2/2019 (LMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 97.101.173.205
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Amir Ghaeenzadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?