Stanley v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Stanley
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00648
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company with Jury Demand. filed by Robert Stanley. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Robert Stanley.(Massey, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: New Jersey. MDL case number: 2750. (SPM)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #7 Order to Show Cause. Additionally, #11 Response to the Court's Order, construed as a Motion to Amend the Complaint, is granted. On or before April 24, 2019, Plaintiff shall amend the Complaint to adequately allege subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/17/2019. (TNP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #9 Order on motion to stayOrder on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #7 Order to show cause filed by Robert Stanley. (Massey, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the District of New Jersey as case 3:19-cv-10203, filed on 4/17/19. (MAA)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 4/11/2019. (MDH)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 motion to stay; Denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall respond to the Order to Show Cause (Doc. 7) by the deadline. In all other respects, this case is STAYED pending transfer. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/11/2019. (DJD)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint or in the alternative Stay on the action as to #7 Order to show cause by Robert Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Massey, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 4/10/2019 (SPM).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 **DISCHARGED PER 12 ORDER** ORDER to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to Robert Stanley. Show Cause Response due by 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/8/2019. (DJD) Modified on 4/18/2019 (SPM).
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Jonathan W. Johnson to appear pro hac vice by Robert Stanley. (Massey, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (SPM)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel, Jonathan W. Johnson, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (copy mailed) (SPM)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2750, In re: Invokana. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 4/5/2019, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (SPM)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-648-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15317992) filed by ROBERT STANLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Massey, Michael) Modified on 4/4/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stanley
Represented By: Michael O. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?