BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. v. Aqueron et al

Plaintiff: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP and BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P.
Defendant: Unknown Tenant II, and any unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, creditors, and other unknown person or unknown spouses claiming by, through and under any of the above-named Defendants, Michael Rodriguez, Unknown Spouse of Aaron Aqueron, Fairwinds Credit Union, Aaron Aqueron, Stonebridge Village Homeowner's Association, Inc., Lizette Rodriguez, Unknown Tenant I and Any unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, creditors, and other unknown person or unknown spouses claiming by, through and under any of the above-named Defendants
Case Number: 6:2019cv00652
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Aaron Aqueron. (JP)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aaron Aqueron. This action is REMANDED to the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/21/2019. (JLC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court: 1. DENY the Motion (Doc. No. 2); 2. REMAND the case; and 3. Direct the Clerk to close the case. A party has fourteen days from this date to file written objections to the Report and Recommendation's factual findings and legal conclusions. Failure to file written objections waives that party's right to challenge on appeal any unobjected-to factual finding or legal conclusion the district judge adopts from the Report and Recommendation. 11th Cir. R. 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/2/2019. (MB)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel (Morgan Bourdat Swenk) of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (AC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron Aqueron. (AC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Court, case number 2010-CA-017579 filed by Aaron Aqueron. (Filed in State Court on 8/3/2010) (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. v. Aqueron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and any unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, creditors, and other unknown person or unknown spouses claiming by, through and under any of the above-named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Aaron Aqueron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairwinds Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Aqueron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebridge Village Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizette Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, creditors, and other unknown person or unknown spouses claiming by, through and under any of the above-named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Morgan Bourdat Swenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Morgan Bourdat Swenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?