Roor International BV et al v. Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Achraf Alami and Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00698
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sasson, Jamie)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing compliance with Related Case Order #5. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Achraf Alami, Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC.(Minerley, Kenneth) Modified on 5/28/2019 (BIA).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/17/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-00698-37TBS. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER In the interests of justice, the undersigned transfers this case to United States Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith, with his permission, to be considered along with Case No.: 6:19-cv-00697-31TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/15/2019. (MB)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' answer or response due 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/13/2019. (MB)
May 12, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/12/19. (PKK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Achraf Alami, Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC. (Minerley, Kenneth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Achraf Alami, Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC. Related case(s): Y (Minerley, Kenneth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Achraf Alami, Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC. (Minerley, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/2/19. (ESG)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV; Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj for Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/22/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/22/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Achraf Alami, Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC. (BIA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-698-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15350572) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Achraf Alami
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Represented By: Ashley Darnelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Smoke Shops, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth L. Minerley
Represented By: Ashley Darnelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?