Sony Corporation v. Soni Interiors LLC

Plaintiff: Sony Corporation
Defendant: Soni Interiors LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00707
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Sony Corporation. (Ford, Taylor)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sony Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Ford, Taylor)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/29/2019. (MAA)
April 25, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Naresh Kilaru & Mark Sommers, appearing on behalf of Sony Corporation (Filing fee $300 receipt number ORL082237. Related document: #9 MOTION for Mark Sommers to appear pro hac vice, #10 MOTION for Naresh Kilaru to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Naresh Kilaru to appear pro hac vice by Sony Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ford, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Mark Sommers to appear pro hac vice by Sony Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ford, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/7/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 4/23/2019. (DJD) ctp
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Naresh Kilaru, Esq. of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed).
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Mark Sommers, Esq. of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed).
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DMA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Soni Interiors LLC. (DMA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-707-Orl-41DCI. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Soni Interiors LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15351471) filed by Sony Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ford, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sony Corporation v. Soni Interiors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Corporation
Represented By: Taylor Flanagan Ford
Represented By: Vincent Falcone, III
Represented By: Mark Sommers
Represented By: Dustin Michael Mauser-Claassen
Represented By: Naresh Kilaru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soni Interiors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?