Armstrong v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Joseph Armstrong
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Waypoint Resource Group, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00769
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 Written designation and consent to act by Alexis Lehmann on behalf of John Joseph Armstrong. Local Counsel: David M. Marco. Non-Resident Counsel: Alexis I. Lehmann. (Lehmann, Alexis)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 motion for Alexis Lehmann, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. After this Order, the Clerk will no longer send copies of docket entries by U.S. Mail to counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/24/2019. (DMA)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Alexis Lehmann to appear pro hac vice by John Joseph Armstrong. (Marco, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Borucke, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trellis Company, Other Affiliate David C. Borucke, Other Affiliate Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Other Affiliate John Joseph Armstrong, Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate David M Marco, Other Affiliate SmithMarco, P.C, Other Affiliate Steven A. Shredl, Other Affiliate Matthew D. Guletz, Other Affiliate Thompson Coburn, LLP for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.. (Borucke, David)
June 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Alexis I. Lehman, appearing on behalf of John Joseph Armstrong (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL083315.). (JP)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Related case(s): No (Maugans, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2019 (LMM).
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Rule 7.1 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Maugans, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2019 (LMM).
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Maugans, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alexander Maugans on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Maugans, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Love, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): no (Love, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Love, John)
May 31, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. Answer due by 6/24/2019. (LMM)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to DEFENDANT WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/31/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 6/24/2019, Defendant Waypoint Resources Group, LLC shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/30/2019.(Irick, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 First Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Complaint by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 5/31/2019 (LMM).
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Borucke on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC (Borucke, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John Joseph Armstrong. Related case(s): no (Marco, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by John Joseph Armstrong. (Marco, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (LMM)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/25/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/25/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by John Joseph Armstrong. (Marco, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (LMM) Modified on 4/25/2019 (LMM).
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-769-Orl-31DCI. (SJB)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Charles Wilson on behalf of John Joseph Armstrong (Wilson, Andrew)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15385288) filed by John Joseph Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Experian, #3 Proposed Summons Equifax, #4 Proposed Summons Waypoint)(Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: David C. Borucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Alexander Maugans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Armstrong
Represented By: Andrew Charles Wilson
Represented By: David M. Marco
Represented By: Alexis Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?