Zalloum v. River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc. et al
Appellee: River Oaks III Homeowners' Association Inc., US Bank National Bank Association, Laura A. Prevesk and River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc.
Appellant: Julie Baker Zalloum
Interested Party: U.S. Bank National Association, BB&T and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00798
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 5 Case Assigned/Reassigned, #4 Order pdf. The Post Office was unable to deliver as addressed and is unable to forward. Mail not resent to Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (RDO)
June 24, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 5 Case Assigned/Reassigned, #4 Order pdf. The Post Office was not able to deliver as addressed and is unable to forward. Mail not resent to BB&T. (RDO)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by River Oaks III Homeowners' Association Inc.. (Malchow, Helena)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #6 Related Case Order by River Oaks III Homeowners' Association Inc.. Related case(s): no (Malchow, Helena) Modified on 6/19/2019 (RDO).
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Laura A. Prevesk, River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc. for Laura A. Prevesk, River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc... (Savona, Therese)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #6 Related Case Order by Laura A. Prevesk, River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Savona, Therese) Modified on 6/17/2019 (RDO).
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Therese Ann Savona on behalf of Laura A. Prevesk, River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc. (Savona, Therese)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief to June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2019. (JRJ)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:19-cv-798-Orl-40. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Judge Paul G. Byron, with his consent, for consideration with Case No. 6:18-cv-341-Orl-40. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (JLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief and to Abate the Appeal by Julie Baker Zalloum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BIA)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: filed by Julie Baker Zalloum. (Attachments: #1 2 6-17-ap-00068 Docket Sheet, #2 3 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000237_Memorandum_Opinion_Resolving_All_Issues_Between_Debtor_and_Association_Claimants_ROCSAs, #3 4 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000238_Partial_Final_Judgment_in_Favor_of_the_ROCSA_Defendants_and_Against_the_Plaintiff_Julie_Za, #4 5 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000253_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Partial_Final_Judgment_and_Memorandum_Opinion, #5 6 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000256_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Jul, #6 6 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000257_Statement_of_Issues_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #7 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_1_Complaint_by_Julie_Baker_Zalloum_against_River_Oaks_Community_Services_Association_Inc_Ri, #8 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #9 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #10 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #11 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_5_Exhibit_D, #12 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_6_Exhibit_E, #13 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_7_Exhibit_F, #14 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_8_Exhibit_G, #15 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_9_Exhibit_H, #16 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_10_Exhibit_I, #17 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_11_Exhibit_J, #18 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_12_Exhibit_K, #19 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_13_Exhibit_L, #20 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_14_Exhibit_M1, #21 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_15_Exhibit_M2, #22 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_16_Exhibit_M3, #23 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_17_Exhibit_N, #24 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_18_Exhibit_P, #25 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_19_Exhibit_Q, #26 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_20_Exhibit_R, #27 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_21_Exhibit_S, #28 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_22_Exhibit_T, #29 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000001_Part_23_Exhibit_U, #30 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000002_Summons_issued_on_River_Oaks_Community_Services_Association_Inc_River_Oaks_III_Homeowners, #31 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000003_Notice_of_Initial_Pretrial_Status_Conference, #32 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000005_Alias_Summons_Issued_on_Laura_A_Prevesk_Answer_Due_6302017_River_Oaks_Community_Servic, #33 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000006_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #34 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000007_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing, #35 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000008_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #36 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000009_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Christopher_R_Evans_on_behalf_of_Defe, #37 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000010_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_File_Responsive_Pleading_or_Otherwise_Answer_Filed_by_Christopher, #38 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000011_Pluries_Summons_Requested_on_Laura_A_Prevesk_Filed_by, #39 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000012_Pluries_Summons_Issued_on_Laura_A_Prevesk_Answer_Due_822017_River_Oaks_Community_Servi, #40 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000013_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time, #41 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000014_Part_1_Certificate_of_Mailing_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_Filed_by_Douglas_Goldin_on_beh, #42 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000014_Part_2_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time, #43 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000015_Part_1_Answer_to_Complaint_and_Affirmative_Defenses, #44 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000015_Part_2_Exhibit_AOM_from_Jarvis_to_MERS, #45 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000015_Part_3_Exhibit_AOM_from_MERS_to_GMAC, #46 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000016_Part_1_Answer_to_Complaint, #47 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000016_Part_2_Exhibit_AOM_from_Jarvis_to_MERS, #48 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000016_Part_3_Exhibit_AOM_from_MERS_to_GMAC, #49 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000017_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Barry_A_Postman_on_behalf_of_Defendan, #50 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000018_Joint_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding_Filed_by_Barry_A_Postman_on_behalf_of_Defenda, #51 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000019_Certificate_of_Mailing_Filed_by_Barry_A_Postman_on_behalf_of_Defendant_Laura_A_Prevesk, #52 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000020_Order_Abating_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding, #53 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000022_Motion_to_Amend_For_Leave_to_File_First_Amended_Complaint_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Z, #54 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000023_Amended_Complaint_First_Amended_Verified_Nature_of_Suit_14, #55 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000024_Exhibit_A_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #56 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000025_Exhibit_B_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #57 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000026_Exhibit_C_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #58 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000027_Exhibit_D_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #59 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000028_Exhibit_E_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #60 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000029_Exhibit_F_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #61 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000030_Exhibit_G_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #62 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000031_Exhibit_H_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #63 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000032_Exhibit_I_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #64 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000033_Exhibit_J_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #65 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000034_Exhibit_K_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #66 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000035_Exhibit_L_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #67 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000036_Exhibit_M_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #68 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000037_Exhibit_M2_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #69 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000038_Exhibit_M3_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #70 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000039_Exhibit_N_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #71 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000040_Exhibit_P_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #72 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000041_Exhibit_Q_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #73 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000042_Exhibit_R_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #74 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000043_Exhibit_S_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #75 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000044_Exhibit_T_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #76 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000045_Exhibit_U_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #77 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000046_Amended_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Ian_L_Koven_on_behalf_of_Defe, #78 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000047_Amended_Motion_to_Dismiss_Adversary_Proceeding_and_Incorporated_Memorandum_Of_Law_Contains, #79 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000048_Notice_If_Intent_To_Seek_Prevailing_Party_Attorneys_Fees_And_Costs_Filed_by_Ian_L_Koven_o, #80 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000049_Amended_Certificate_of_Mailing_Filed_by_Ian_L_Koven_on_behalf_of_Defendant_River_Oaks_Comm, #81 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000050_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behalf_of, #82 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000051_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Helena_Gutierrez_Malchow_on_behalf_of, #83 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000052_Joinder_In_Amended_Joint_Motion_to_Dismiss_and_Incorporated_Memorandum_of_Law_Filed_by_Hel, #84 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000053_Joinder_in_Amended_Joint_Motion_to_Dismiss_and_Incorporated_Memorandum_of_Law_Filed_by_Hel, #85 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000054_Objection_to_Amended_Motion_to_Dismiss_Complaint_and_Request_for_Hearing_Filed_by_Plaintif, #86 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000055_Summons_Returned_Unexecuted_Re, #87 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000056_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing, #88 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000057_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #89 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000058_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Chris_Evans_US_Bank_Atty_Dave_Huxtab, #90 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000059_Request_for_Hearing_on_Matters_Heard_Without_Timely_Notice_to_Plaintiff_on_09-20-2017_File, #91 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000060_Opposition_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Request_for_Rehearing_On_Matters_Heard_Without_Timely_N, #92 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000061_Joinder_of_Response_in_Opposition_to_Request_for_Rehearing_on_Matters_Heard_without_Timely, #93 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000062_Notice_of_Hearing, #94 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000063_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #95 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000064_Part_1_Counterclaim_by_US_Bank_National_Bank_Association_as_Trustee_against_River_Oaks_Community, #96 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000064_Part_2_Exhibit_Ex_A_-_Note, #97 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000064_Part_3_Exhibit_Exh_B_-_Mortgage, #98 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000064_Part_4_Exhibit_Exh_C_-_Jarvis_Assignment, #99 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000064_Part_5_Exhibit_Exh_D_-_MortgageIT_Assignment, #100 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000064_Part_6_Exhibit_Exh_E_-_Wild_Release, #101 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000064_Part_7_Exhibit_Exh_F_-_GMAC_Assignment, #102 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000065_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Doug_Goldin, #103 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_1_Bench_Brief_Filed_by_Plaintiff_Julie_Baker_Zalloum, #104 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_2_Exhibit, #105 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_3_Exhibit, #106 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_4_Exhibit, #107 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_5_Exhibit, #108 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_6_Exhibit, #109 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_7_Exhibit, #110 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_8_Exhibit, #111 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000066_Part_9_Exhibit, #112 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000068_Order_Striking_Bench_Brief_Without_Prejudice, #113 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000069_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Leave_to_File_Amended_Complaint_Denying_as_Moot_Amended_Motion, #114 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000070_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #115 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000071_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #116 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000072_Request_for_Production_re_River_Oaks_III_Homeowners_Association_Inc_Filed_by_Plaintiff_J, #117 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000073_Request_for_Interragatories_re_River_Oaks_III_Homeowners_Association_Inc_Filed_by_Plai, #118 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000074_Request_for_Admissions_re_River_Oaks_III_Homeowners_Association_Inc_Filed_by_Plaintiff, #119 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000075_Request_for_Priduction_re_US_Bank_National_Associatioln_as_Trustee_for_Mastr_Adjustable, #120 6-17-ap-00068_Docket_000076_Request_for_Interragatories_re_US_Bank_National_Associatioln_as_Trustee_for_Mastr_Adjus, #121 6-17-a
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of interlocutory appeal by Julie Baker Zalloum. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:17-ap-68-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 04/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal)(BIA) Modified on 4/29/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zalloum v. River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: River Oaks III Homeowners' Association Inc.
Represented By: Helena Gutierrez Malchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Bank National Bank Association
Represented By: Steven Joseph Brotman
Represented By: Michael Peter De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Laura A. Prevesk
Represented By: Ian L. Koven
Represented By: Barry A. Postman
Represented By: Therese Ann Savona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: River Oaks Community Services Association, Inc.
Represented By: Helena Gutierrez Malchow
Represented By: Therese Ann Savona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julie Baker Zalloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BB&T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?