U.S. Space Walk of Fame Foundation, Inc. v. American Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Space Walk of Fame Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: American Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00829
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LMM)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2019, Discovery due by 10/4/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2019, Pretrial statement due by 3/12/2020, All other motions due by 2/25/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/2/2019, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/2/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Conduct mediation hearing by 10/18/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (RMF)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 26,2019 before Brenda J. Newman. (Newman, Brenda)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Buckley, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to strike re: #12 Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/29/2019. (EC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 **STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER** CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Buckley, Michael) Modified on 5/29/2019 (LMM).
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Telephonic Case Management Conference by American Property Insurance Company. (Buckley, Michael) Modified on 5/29/2019 (LMM).
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Remark: Docs. #6 and #9 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/23/19. (ESG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by U.S. Space Walk of Fame Foundation, Inc.. (Struble, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by U.S. Space Walk of Fame Foundation, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Struble, Matthew) Modified on 5/23/2019 (LMM).
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by American Property Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Buckley, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2019 (LMM).
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by American Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Relational Group Partners, Inc. for American Property Insurance Company.. (Buckley, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by American Property Insurance Company.(Buckley, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/8/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/8/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-829-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Civil Court, case number 05-2019-CA-022944 filed in State Court on April 2, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15415908 filed by American Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buckley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Space Walk of Fame Foundation, Inc. v. American Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael B. Buckley
Represented By: Jennifer E. Seipel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Space Walk of Fame Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Struble
Represented By: Joshua La Don Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?