Saleh v. Stickler

Plaintiff: Sherif Saleh
Defendant: David Eugene Stickler
Case Number: 6:2019cv00832
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Amended Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/19/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Evelev, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Sherif Saleh. (Platt, Jack) Modified on 6/4/2019 (BIA).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/31/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/29/19. (ESG)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Sherif Saleh. (Platt, Jack) Modified on 5/29/2019 (BIA).
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Sherif Saleh. (Platt, Jack)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack L. Platt on behalf of Sherif Saleh (Platt, Jack)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/8/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/8/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Remark: Doc. #6 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/6/19. (ESG)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Eugene Stickler. (Merrill, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David Eugene Stickler. Related case(s): no (Merrill, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by David Eugene Stickler.(Merrill, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel James L. Torres of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk) (ctp). (BIA)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-832-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 05-2019-CA-016197 filed in State Court on February 13, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15416763 filed by David Eugene Stickler. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merrill, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleh v. Stickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherif Saleh
Represented By: James L. Torres
Represented By: Jack L. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Eugene Stickler
Represented By: Michael J. Merrill
Represented By: David Ross Evelev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?