The Postcard Factory, Inc. v. Clean Harbors Florida, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Postcard Factory, Inc.
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. and Clean Harbors Florida, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00833
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Julie Walbroel appointed as mediator. (RDO)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2019, Discovery due by 7/17/2020, Dispositive motions due by 8/18/2020, All other motions due by 11/18/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/18/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/18/2020, Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/23/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/28/2019. (MKH)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-00833-Orl-LRH. Judge Carlos E. Mendoza no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Clean Harbors Florida, LLC, Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., The Postcard Factory, Inc.. (DMA)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/24/2019. (DJD)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Reilly, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/5/2019. (MKH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically to conduct Case Management Conference by The Postcard Factory, Inc.. (Reilly, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (McDonough, Sean) Modified on 5/22/2019 (DMA).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Postcard Factory, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Reilly, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2019 (DMA).
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by The Postcard Factory, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company for The Postcard Factory, Inc... (Reilly, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/21/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 5/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc..(McDonough, Sean)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-833-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 2019-CA-001916 filed in State Court on 02/13/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15416830 filed by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Docket, #4 Exhibit Remaining State Court Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonough, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Postcard Factory, Inc. v. Clean Harbors Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Postcard Factory, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Michael McDonough
Represented By: Jacqueline McClure Bertelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?