Purvis et al v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Purvis and Michelle Purvis
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00864
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Borucke, David) Modified on 6/21/2019 (SPM).
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trellis Company, Other Affiliate David C. Borucke, Other Affiliate Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Other Affiliate Max Story, Other Affiliate Jason Purvis, Other Affiliate Michelle Purvis, Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Max Story, P.A, Other Affiliate Steven A. Shredl, Other Affiliate Matthew D. Guletz, Other Affiliate Thompson Coburn, LLP for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.. (Borucke, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Love, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): no (Love, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Love, John)
May 31, 2019 Set deadlines: for Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. Answer due by 6/21/2019. (SPM)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendant Waypoint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Waypoint Resource Group, LLC shall file a response to the Complaint on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/31/2019. (HMK)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant Waypoint by 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/31/2019. (DJD) ctp
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 21, 2019, to File Response/Reply to #1 Complaint by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Borucke, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 5/30/2019 (SPM).
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Borucke on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC (Borucke, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related case order by Jason Purvis, Michelle Purvis. Related case(s): no (Story, Max) Modified on 5/21/2019 (SPM).
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Jason Purvis, Michelle Purvis. (Story, Max) Modified on 5/21/2019 (SPM).
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 05/10/2019 by Jason Purvis, Michelle Purvis as to Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Story, Max)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 05/10/2019 by Jason Purvis, Michelle Purvis as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Story, Max)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/21/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 5/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (DMA)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-864-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15435904) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Waypoint, #2 Proposed Summons Equifax, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Griffin, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purvis et al v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: David C. Borucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Purvis
Represented By: Max H. Story
Represented By: Austin James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Purvis
Represented By: Max H. Story
Represented By: Austin James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?