Calderon et al v. U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for SG Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FRE2 Asset Backed Certificates Series 2006-FRE2
Plaintiff: Altagracia Calderon, Carmen V. Ortiz. and Oscar Calderon
Defendant: Does 1-10 Inclusive and U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for SG Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FRE2 Asset Backed Certificates Series 2006-FRE2
Case Number: 6:2019cv00890
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order #4 and Interested Persons Order #5. Responses due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/15/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/15/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for SG Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FRE2 Asset Backed Certificates Series 2006-FRE2. (BIA)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-890-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/PETITION to Enforce Rescission and for Declaratory Relief against U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for SG Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FRE2 Asset Backed Certificates Series 2006-FRE2, Does 1-10 Inclusive with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15449561) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Barnes, William) Modified on 5/13/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderon et al v. U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for SG Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FRE2 Asset Backed Certificates Series 2006-FRE2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altagracia Calderon
Represented By: William J. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen V. Ortiz.
Represented By: William J. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Calderon
Represented By: William J. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for SG Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FRE2 Asset Backed Certificates Series 2006-FRE2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?