Reiffer v. International Tar Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Defendant: International Tar Association, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00893
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to International Tar Association, Inc. (LMM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Paul Reiffer re #11 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against International Tar Association, Inc. of Filing Exhibit A to Declaration of Joel B. Rothman in Support (Rothman, Joel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against International Tar Association, Inc. by Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman)(Rothman, Joel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on May 23, 2019 by Paul Reiffer as to International Tar Association, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Paul Reiffer. Related case(s): no (Rothman, Joel) Modified on 5/20/2019 (LMM).
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/15/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/15/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LMM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to International Tar Association, Inc. (LMM)
May 12, 2019 Filing 4 Remark: Doc. #2 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/12/19. (PKK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-893-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Paul Reiffer. (Rothman, Joel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against International Tar Association, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15451573) filed by Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiffer v. International Tar Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: Ana Paula Moretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Tar Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?