Reyes Salgado v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank

Plaintiff: Juan Reyes Salgado
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 6:2019cv00912
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (JLC) Modified on 7/9/2019 (JLC).
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Paper Received From Pro Se Plaintiff by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank re #17 Order on motion to dismiss (Keller, Courtney) Modified on 7/3/2019 (BIA).
June 25, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/11/2019 (BIA)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part as unopposed #16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (JLC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. (Keller, Courtney)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/28/19. (ESG)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. (Keller, Courtney)
May 23, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Answer due by 6/6/2019. (BIA)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #3 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (JLC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. Related case(s): yes (Keller, Courtney) Modified on 5/24/2019 (BIA).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #8 Order to Show Cause in light of Defendant's response #10. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (ESG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to show cause filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Keller, Courtney)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 **Entered in Error**
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to show cause why its claim for jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 should not be remanded due to deficient citizenship allegations as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. Show Cause Response due by 5/22/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/15/2019. (JLC)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/15/2019. (JLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (Keller, Courtney) Modified on 5/16/2019 (BIA).
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/15/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/15/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. Originally filed in Orange County Circuit Court on 05/14/2019. (BIA)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-912-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-004454-O filed in State Court on 04/10/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15464068 filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions Motion to Dismiss, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Notice of Appearance, #5 State Court Other Documents Issued Summons, #6 State Court Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Courtney) Modified on 5/15/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes Salgado v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Reyes Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Courtney M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Courtney M. Keller
Represented By: Tyrone Andre Adras
Represented By: Colin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?